Keesee v. Mitchell
Appellant: Brian Keith Keesee
Appellee: Kimberly Nifong Mitchell
Case Number: 7:2019cv00134
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Brian Keith Keesee. (Chleborowicz, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Howard, A)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Howard, A)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 17, 2019, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc.. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (Howard, A)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Appellee's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation in Main Case, #2 Docket for Main Case 11-08880-8-SWH) (McNeill, A)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designations, #2 Appellant's Designations: Docket Entries 423 - 495, Main Case, #3 Appellant's Designations: Docket Entries 515 - 525, Main Case, #4 Appellant's Designations: Adversary Proceeding 13-00043-8-SWH (Including Entire Docket Sheet), #5 Docket in Main Case 11-08880-8-SWH) (Howard, A)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kimberly Nifong Mitchell (Haidt, David) Modified on 8/7/2019 - counsel used wrong event, case manager edited docket text to the correct identification of the document attached. (Sellers, N.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by David J. Haidt on behalf of Kimberly Nifong Mitchell. (Haidt, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Alan E. Toll on behalf of Kimberly Nifong Mitchell. (Toll, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Brian Keith Keesee (Chleborowicz, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher A. Chleborowicz on behalf of Brian Keith Keesee. (Chleborowicz, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 11-08880-8-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse filed July 9, 2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keesee v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brian Keith Keesee
Represented By: Christopher A. Chleborowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kimberly Nifong Mitchell
Represented By: David J. Haidt
Represented By: Alan E. Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?