Johnson v. Novant Health Brunswick Medical Center
Plaintiff: Evette Marie Johnson
Defendant: Novant Health Brunswick Medical Center
Case Number: 7:2019cv00155
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 PARTICULARIZED COMPLAINT against Novant Health Brunswick Medical Center filed by Evette Marie Johnson. (Lee, L.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's filings fail to establish that the court has subject-matter jurisdiction and that her claims are not frivolous. Rather than recommending dismissal, the court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to PARTICULARIZE her complaint by filing with the court, on or before December 9, 2019, a revised complaint setting forth the factual basis of her Title VII claims and attaching a copy of her charge of discrimination filed with the EEOC or otherwise demonstrating she exhausted her administrative remedies prior to initiating this action. After Plaintiff has submitted her particularized complaint, the court will conduct a frivolity review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether any of her claims should be dismissed. Plaintiff is warned that failure to file a particularized complaint as ordered herein may result in dismissal of her claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 11/14/2019. (Rudd, D.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Suit Rights filed by Evette Marie Johnson regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Rudd, D.)
September 9, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Evette Marie Johnson has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Rudd, D.)
August 22, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Lee, L.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Evette Marie Johnson. (Grady, B.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Evette Marie Johnson. (Grady, B.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Evette Marie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Supplemental Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Waiver of Service of Summons Documents) (Grady, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Novant Health Brunswick Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evette Marie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Health Brunswick Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?