Thomas v. Craige
Plaintiff: Tony C. Thomas
Defendant: Lawrence S. Craige
Case Number: 7:2019cv00181
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Notice regarding #5 Financial Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff did not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, regarding privacy protection. A party waives the federal rule privacy protection by filing the documents without redaction. For additional information, refer to the Privacy Notice located under the Self Representation section of the court's website (www.nced.uscourts.gov). The Financial Disclosure Statement has been placed under temporary seal to allow plaintiff to take corrective action. This notice and above-referenced Privacy Notice sent to Tony Thomas via US Mail on 10/24/19. (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk regarding issuance and enclosure of summons and directive to proceed with service under Rule 4(m). (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Lawrence S. Craige. (Collins, S.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Corrected Proposed Summons filed by Tony C. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Tony Thomas advising of deficient summons provided for issuance. (Collins, S.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Proposed Summons filed by Tony C. Thomas. (Collins, S.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Tony C. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.) Modified on 10/24/2019 to provisionally seal due to confidential identifying information. (Collins, S.).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Proof of Service filed by Tony C. Thomas served on H. Kenneth Stephens, II via certified mail on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/23/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Tony C. Thomas, 820 South 10th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401.) (Collins, S.)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Tony C. Thomas. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Tony C. Thomas. (Rudd, D.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrence S. Craige (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL074208), filed by Tony C. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter from Supreme Court of North Carolina to Tony C. Thomas dated 8/22/2019, #2 Exhibit B- Letter from the North Carolina Court of Appeals dated 5/16/2019, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Craige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence S. Craige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?