PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. Garner et al
Appellee: Jospeh A. Bledsoe, Chapter 13 Trustee and Stephanie Lynn Garner
Appellant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 7:2019cv00182
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Appellant's BRIEF by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Ewing, Baxter)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Stouch, L.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (McNeill, A)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 16, 2019, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc.. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Appellee's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1-5 from Designations, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet from Case # 19-01028-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1-4; and 7-9 from Designations, #2 PennyMac Loan Services, LLC's Proof of Claim filed May 16, 2019, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet from Case# 19-01028-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Ewing, Baxter)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Lynn Garner (Cook, Richard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Stephanie Lynn Garner. (Cook, Richard)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Baxter Chad Ewing on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Ewing, Baxter)
September 23, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01028-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse filed September 12, 2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. Garner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jospeh A. Bledsoe, Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stephanie Lynn Garner
Represented By: Richard Preston Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Baxter Chad Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?