Santos et al v. M.A.C. Grading Co. et al
Plaintiff: Gilberto Sanjuan Gonzalez, R Santos Gonzales, Benjamin Sanjuan Gonzalez, Gilberto Gonzalez Sanjuan, Benjamin Gonzalez Sanjuan and Panfilo Santos Santos
Defendant: Christopher Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co. and Melissa D. Hales
Case Number: 7:2019cv00219
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Stephanie M. Poucher on behalf of All Defendants. (Poucher, Stephanie)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Brandon E. Davis on behalf of Christopher Hales, Melissa D. Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co.. (Davis, Brandon)
November 26, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including January 14, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/26/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
November 26, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Christopher Hales, Melissa D. Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Huff, Nathan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Christopher Hales, Melissa D. Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co. (Huff, Nathan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Andrew Huff on behalf of Christopher Hales, Melissa D. Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co.. (Huff, Nathan)
November 21, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Christopher Hales, Melissa D. Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Benjamin Sanjuan Gonzalez (Willis, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by R Santos Gonzales, Benjamin Sanjuan Gonzalez, Gilberto Sanjuan Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Financial Disclosure Statement by Benjamin Gonzalez Sanjuan, #2 Exhibit Financial Disclosure Statement by Gilberto Gonzalez Sanjuan) (Willis, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert J. Willis on behalf of R Santos Gonzales, Benjamin Sanjuan Gonzalez, Gilberto Sanjuan Gonzalez. (Willis, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Panfilo Gonzalez Santos, Benjamin Gonzalez Sanjuan, and Gilberto Gonzalez Sanjuan against Christopher Hales, Melissa D. Hales, M.A.C. Grading Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5174760.), filed by Gilberto Sanjuan Gonzalez, R Santos Gonzales, Benjamin Sanjuan Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Sue under 29 USC Section 216(b) by Panfilo Gonzalez Santos, #2 Exhibit Consent to Sue under 29 USC Section 216(b) by Benjamin Gonzalez Sanjuan, #3 Exhibit Consent to Sue under 29 USC Section 216(b) by Gilberto Gonzalez Sanjuan, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for case, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for M.A.C. Grading Co., #6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Christopher Hales, #7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Melissa D. Hales) (Willis, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. M.A.C. Grading Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hales
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Stephanie M. Poucher
Represented By: Brandon E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.C. Grading Co.
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Stephanie M. Poucher
Represented By: Brandon E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa D. Hales
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Stephanie M. Poucher
Represented By: Brandon E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Sanjuan Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Santos Gonzales
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Sanjuan Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Gonzalez Sanjuan
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Gonzalez Sanjuan
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panfilo Santos Santos
Represented By: Robert J. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?