M.D. Russell Construction, Inc. v. Consolidated Staffing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Verliance, Inc. f/k/a Altus Global Recovery, Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions, Consolidated Staffing, Inc., Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions and Verliance, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00221
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Parsons, Kevin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #19 MOTION to Remand , #20 Memorandum in Support, filed by Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Partial Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Email with Attached Full Amended Complaint) (Warf, D.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and First Amended Complaint as received by CSI from Plaintiff) (Parsons, Kevin)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2/3/19 Court Order) (Frost, Joseph)
December 10, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions' time to respond is extended up to and including January 8, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/9/2019. (Stouch, L.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support regarding #19 MOTION to Remand filed by M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - CSI 2018 Annual Report, #3 Exhibit C - Summons and Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Second Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Application for Certificate of Authority) (Van Winkle, Landon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand filed by M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.. (Van Winkle, Landon)
December 6, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to the Clerk of Court: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
December 5, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #17 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendant Consolidated Staffing, Inc., it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including December 19, 2019, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #6 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/5/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
December 5, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Warf, D.)
December 5, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS. (Stouch, L.)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Frost, Joseph)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by D. Martin Warf on behalf of Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions. (Warf, D.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A. Stafford on behalf of Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions. (Stafford, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions (Stafford, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 Notice filed by Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder and Consent to Removal. (Stafford, Mark)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by M.D. Russell Construction, Inc. as to VERLIANCE, INC. f/k/a ALTUS GLOBAL RECOVERY, INC. d/b/a ALTUS GLOBAL TRADE SOLUTIONS. (Frost, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Landon G. Van Winkle on behalf of M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.. (Van Winkle, Landon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Philip Andrew Hinson on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Hinson, Philip)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by M.D. Russell Construction, Inc. (Frost, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Incomplete Amended Complaint Mailed to Consolidated Staffing by Plaintiff) (Parsons, Kevin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Parsons, Kevin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. (Parsons, Kevin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. regarding Notice of Deficiency - JS44 Civil Cover Sheet. (Parsons, Kevin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' Counsel Joseph Z. Frost of Stubbs & Perdue, P.A., 9208 Falls of Neuse Road, Suite 201, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on November 12, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel failed to file JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel have to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin V. Parsons on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Parsons, Kevin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. from Onslow County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-3176. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5177365), filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Copy of Amended Complaint from Onslow County Superior Court, #3 Exhibit B- State Court Pleadings) (Parsons, Kevin) Modified on 11/12/2019 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.D. Russell Construction, Inc. v. Consolidated Staffing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verliance, Inc. f/k/a Altus Global Recovery, Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin V. Parsons
Represented By: Philip Andrew Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altus Receivables Management, Inc. f/k/a Altus GTS Inc. d/b/a Altus Global Trade Solutions
Represented By: Mark A. Stafford
Represented By: D. Martin Warf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Russell Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Represented By: Landon G. Van Winkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?