Burgess v. Pfizer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Albert C. Burgess, Jr.
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00235
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #4 MOTION to Dismiss In Further Support filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #4 MOTION to Dismiss iled by Albert C. Burgess, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lyrica safety information, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Albert C. Burgess, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Albert C. Burgess, Jr. (Collins, S.)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 2/29/2020. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/31/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Albert C. Burgess, Jr., 88539-071, Marion - USP, P.O. Box 1000, Marion, IL 62959.) (Collins, S.)
December 30, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. (Collins, S.)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Albert C. Burgess, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Tripp, S.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Albert Burgess with second copy of notice of removal and blank forms for notice of self representation and financial disclosure statement. (Collins, S.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Albert C. Burgess, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Order of Gorham, #2 Business Corporation Annual Report for Pfizer, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Albert C. Burgess, Jr. regarding Text Order entered this date. (Collins, S.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Notice filed by Pfizer, Inc. of Filing Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal) (DeAntonio, Matthew)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay these activities. Unless a party raises objection in filing due within 14 days from this date, the court stays the parties' scheduling conference activities pending decision on motion filed 12/3/19. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/4/2019. (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Albert C. Burgess, Jr. as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 12/23/2019. (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:19-CV-235-FL. No further filing shall be made in 4:19-CV-170-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/3/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Albert C. Burgess, Jr., 88539-071, Marion - USP, P.O. Box 1000, Marion, IL 62959.) (Collins, S.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Self Representation mailed via US Mail to Albert C. Burgess, Jr., Reg. No. 88539-071 at Marion - USP, P.O. Box 1000, Marion, IL 62959 along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.)
December 3, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-3] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
December 3, 2019 Notice to Counsel: This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
December 3, 2019 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 12/03/2019. Case Number 4:19-cv-170-FL. (Collins, S.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTED Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet Notice filed by Pfizer, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet [Doc. 1-4]. (DeAntonio, Matthew) Modified on 12/3/2019 to reflect that the document has been corrected. (Rudd, D.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support regarding #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pfizer, Inc. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. DeAntonio on behalf of Pfizer, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pfizer, Inc. from Superior Court of New Hanover County, case number 19-cvs-3043. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5202376), filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filing, #2 Exhibit B - Pfizer 2019 Annual Report - HIGHLIGHTED, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (DeAntonio, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert C. Burgess, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. DeAntonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?