Hensler Surgical Products, LLC v. Tobra Medical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hensler Surgical Products, LLC
Defendant: Tobra Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00240
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 3/5/20. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/30/2020. (Collins, S.)
January 28, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert J. Morris on behalf of Tobra Medical, Inc.. (Morris, Robert)
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tobra Medical, Inc. (Morris, Robert)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tobra Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Morris Ltr. 12/5/19, #2 Exhibit Hensler Press Release 12/5/19) (Morris, Robert)
January 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tobra Medical, Inc.. (Morris, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William B. Dyer on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Dyer, William)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #13 Notice of Special Appearance. This document is entitled "Notice of Special Appearance" however the body of the document appears to be a request for a change of address. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S.)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #14 ** Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William B. Dyer on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Dyer, William) Modified on 1/15/2020 (Collins, S.).
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Change of Address filed by William B. Dyer filed by on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Dyer, William)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ryan P. Gentes on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Gentes, Ryan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address filed by Ryan P. Gentes filed by on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Gentes, Ryan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Andrew G. Strickland on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Strickland, Andrew)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Change of Address filed by Andrew G. Strickland filed by on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Strickland, Andrew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. Tobra Medical, Inc. waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Bowman, Marla)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tobra Medical, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on December 6, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph A. Schouten on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Schouten, Joseph)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hensler Surgical Products, LLC identifying Corporate Parent S & T Holdings, LLC for Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Bowman, Marla)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Marla Spector Bowman on behalf of Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Bowman, Marla)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tobra Medical, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26LVMN5B.), filed by Hensler Surgical Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 10,493,183, #2 Exhibit B - Tobra's Bone Basket IFU, #3 Exhibit C- Tobra's Bone Basket Brochure, #4 Exhibit D - Comparison Chart, #5 Exhibit E - 12.03.2019 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Claim Chart, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowman, Marla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensler Surgical Products, LLC v. Tobra Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hensler Surgical Products, LLC
Represented By: Marla Spector Bowman
Represented By: Joseph A. Schouten
Represented By: William B. Dyer
Represented By: Andrew G. Strickland
Represented By: Ryan P. Gentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobra Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?