Bradshaw v. Grady
Plaintiff: Joshua B. Bradshaw
Defendant: Cale Lee Grady
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 7:2019cv00248
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's time to respond is extended from January 10, 2020, until ten (10) days after the parties attend private mediation. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/9/2020. (Jenkins, C.)
January 8, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Document, Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Document, Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Cale Lee Grady. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Wade)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Wade M. Smith on behalf of Cale Lee Grady. (Smith, Wade)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of Joshua B. Bradshaw. (Parrish, Michael)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul A. Fanning on behalf of Joshua B. Bradshaw. (Fanning, Paul)
December 20, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Consent Order Withdrawing Order of Reference entered in District Court. (RE: related document(s) #3 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Plaintiff Joshua B. Bradshaw). (Howard, Allyson) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (Related Doc #9 ) Answer due by 1/10/2020. (Bissette, Amy) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by William E. Brewer Jr. on behalf of Cale Lee Grady. (Brewer, William) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Paul Fanning. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. (related document no. #3 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Joshua B. Bradshaw) Due by 12/16/2019. (Donnery, Erin) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by William E. Brewer, Jr. for Cale Lee Grady filed by Paul A. Fanning on behalf of Joshua B. Bradshaw. (Fanning, Paul) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Certificate of Service filed by Paul A. Fanning on behalf of Joshua B. Bradshaw (RE: related document(s) #3 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference). F(Fanning, Paul) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by William E. Brewer Jr. on behalf of Cale Lee Grady. (Brewer, William) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 First Amended Complaint against Cale Lee Grady. filed by Paul A. Fanning on behalf of Joshua B. Bradshaw (RE: related document(s) #1 Complaint). (Fanning, Paul) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Answer due by 12/12/2019 (adi) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Receipt Of Filing Fee For Motion for Withdrawal of Reference (19-00165-5-SWH) [motion,mwdref] (181.00), Receipt Number A15161423, Amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Paul A. Fanning on behalf of Joshua B. Bradshaw. (Fanning, Paul) **Certificate of service amended by docket entry 6.** Modified on 11/19/2019 (Donnery, Erin). Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Erin Donnery (Parker, Wendy) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint (19-00165-5-SWH) [cmp,cmp] (350.00), Receipt Number A15161060, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued on Cale Lee Grady Answer Due 12/12/2019 (Fanning, Paul) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Adversary case 19-00165-5. Complaint by Joshua B. Bradshaw against Cale Lee Grady (Fee Paid) (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Fanning, Paul) Transferred to the United States District Court (EDNC) on 12/20/2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradshaw v. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cale Lee Grady
Represented By: William E. Brewer, Jr.
Represented By: Wade M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua B. Bradshaw
Represented By: Paul A. Fanning
Represented By: John M. Martin
Represented By: Michael J. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?