Swanson v. NC Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Gary Swanson
Defendant: Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc. and NC Department of Transportation
Case Number: 7:2020cv00045
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations re #2 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The remainder of the memorandum and recommendation, regarding whether Plaintiff's Complaint [DE-3] is legally frivolous and fails to allege subject matter jurisdiction, is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending Plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint. If Plaintiff chooses to file such an amended complaint, he is DIRECTED to do so within 30 days, by May 18, 2020. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers, II on 4/17/2020. Copy sent to Gary Swanson 310 N Front St., Ste. 408, Wilmington, NC 28401-3909 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 14, 2020 Motions Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gary Swanson. (Edwards, S.)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 OBJECTION (titled Cause of Action) to #2 Memorandum and Recommendations by Gary Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc., NC Department of Transportation, filed by Gary Swanson. (Edwards, S.)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gary Swanson and Recommending that the case be dismissed. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 4/10/2020. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 3/27/2020. Copy sent to Gary Swanson, 310 N Front St., Ste. 408, Wilmington, NC 28401-3909 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 16, 2020 Motion Referred to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Edwards, S.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Gary Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. NC Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?