Riley v. Cephas et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Riley
Defendant: Lance Cephas and Raymond Holliday
Case Number: 7:2020cv00046
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Edwards, S.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday. (Fulton, Joseph)
April 23, 2020 Referred the parties proposed discovery plan at docket entry #16 to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly Swank for an entry of a scheduling order. (Edwards, S.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday. (Martineau, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Edwards, S.)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition #7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Barbara Riley. (Hinton, Meredith) Modified on 4/13/2020 to create the document relationship (Edwards, S.).
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Claims by Barbara Riley. This is as to all claims against Lance Cephas d/b/a Lance Cephas Services but not as to Lance Cephas Individually and the Plaintiff's Fifth Claim for Relief against Defendant Cephas. (Hinton, Meredith) Modified on 4/13/2020 to correct the document description (Edwards, S.).
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Barbara Riley (Hinton, Meredith)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Meredith S. Hinton on behalf of Barbara Riley. (Hinton, Meredith)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/23/2020. (Edwards, S.)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 State Court Record received (Fulton, Joseph)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday. (Fulton, Joseph)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday. (Fulton, Joseph)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday. (Fulton, Joseph)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lance Cephas (Martineau, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Raymond Holliday (Martineau, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth A. Martineau on behalf of Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday. (Martineau, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by Lance Cephas, Raymond Holliday regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Martineau, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at 2221 Stantonsburg Road, Greenville, NC 27834 mailed via US Mail on March 16, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
March 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Lance Cephas. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lance Cephas from Onslow County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-4077. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5355028), filed by Lance Cephas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, Summons, and Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Martineau, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Cephas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Cephas
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Martineau
Represented By: Joseph W. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Holliday
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Martineau
Represented By: Joseph W. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Riley
Represented By: Meredith S. Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?