Smith v. Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.
Interested Party: Stephanie J. Butler
Appellee: Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.
Appellant: Keith Smith
Case Number: 7:2020cv00056
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Motion Submitted to Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in Support regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Keith Smith. (Fields, James) Modified on 4/21/2020 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Produce Distributors, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.. (Newton, Steven)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Luther Donald Starling, Jr on behalf of Keith Smith. (Starling, Luther)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of Keith Smith. (Parrish, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Keith Smith (Fields, James)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by James Michael Fields on behalf of Keith Smith. (Fields, James)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Keith Smith. (Northen, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order filed by Keith Smith. [Filed in US Bankruptcy Court on 3/24/2020]. (Rudd, D.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal from Interlocutory Order filed by Keith Smith. [Filed in the US Bankruptcy Court on 3/24/2020]. (Rudd, D.)
March 27, 2020 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Senior United States District Judge Malcolm J. Howard for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:20-CV-66-H. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/27/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
March 26, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00067-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order filed March 11, 2020) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephanie J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Southern Produce Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Craig Newton, II
Represented By: Gregory Byrd Crampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Keith Smith
Represented By: James Michael Fields
Represented By: Luther D Starling, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Northen
Represented By: Michael J. Parrish
Represented By: Luther Donald Starling, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?