Kendall et al v. Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC
Plaintiff: Karl Kendall, Suzanne Rainey and Vincenzo Pernice
Defendant: John Does 1-30, The Benefits Administrative Committee, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC and Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00071
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Emily S. Costin on behalf of Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, The Benefits Administrative Committee. (Costin, Emily)
May 11, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #16 filed by Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, and The Benefits Administrative Committee. For good cause shown, these defendants have up to and including July 31, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/11/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
May 11, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, The Benefits Administrative Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waiver of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Kingsbery, Kelsey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Benefits Administrative Committee (Kingsbery, Kelsey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC (Kingsbery, Kelsey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PPD, Inc. for Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC. (Kingsbery, Kelsey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Kelsey Kingsbery on behalf of Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, The Benefits Administrative Committee. (Kingsbery, Kelsey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Patrick McGuire on behalf of Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC, The Benefits Administrative Committee. (McGuire, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Vincenzo Pernice (Reavey, Donald)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Suzanne Rainey (Reavey, Donald)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Karl Kendall (Reavey, Donald)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark K. Gyandoh on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gyandoh, Mark)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Donald R. Reavey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Reavey, Donald)
April 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint. Counsel has not provided proposed summons(es) for all of the parties for service of this action. Please file additional proposed summonses using the 'Notice-other' event. (Sellers, N.)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
April 16, 2020 Case transferred in from Western Division on 04/16/2020. Old Case Number 5:20-cv-157. (Sellers, N.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:20-CV-71-D. No further filing shall be made in 5:20-CV-157-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/16/2020. (Sellers, N.)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Karl Kendall, Vincenzo Pernice, Suzanne Rainey. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file their own Notice of Appearance or Notice of Special Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) or Local Civil Rule 83.1(e) in order to receive a notice of electronic filing "NEF". (Rudd, D.)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Szymankiewicz, John)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Szymankiewicz, John)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5392331.), filed by Karl Kendall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Szymankiewicz, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendall et al v. Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Kendall
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Rainey
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincenzo Pernice
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Benefits Administrative Committee
Represented By: Emily S. Costin
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Kelsey Kingsbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC
Represented By: Emily S. Costin
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Kelsey Kingsbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors of Pharmaceutical Product Development, LLC
Represented By: Emily S. Costin
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Represented By: Kelsey Kingsbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?