Johnson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stephen Johnson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 7:2020cv00135
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul on 8/4/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 8/5/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Stouch, L.)
July 21, 2020 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Stephen Johnson. (Sellers, N.)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/21/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 16, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephen Johnson (Hall, Charlotte)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Stephen Johnson. (Hall, Charlotte)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Stephen Johnson. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Johnson
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?