Staffing Advantage, L.L.C. v. Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.
Defendant: Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00150
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including November 2, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
October 2, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stanfield, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sophia V. Blair on behalf of Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Blair, Sophia)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin J. Stanfield on behalf of Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Stanfield, Kevin)
August 28, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #5 Notice of Appearance and #6 Notice of Appearance. Counsel is reminded that in future filings the case number should read 7:20-CV-150-M. The "M" signifies the judge assignment. No action by counsel is required at this time. (Waddell, K.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Kristen MJ Johnson on behalf of Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.. (Johnson, Kristen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by David M. Duke on behalf of Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.. (Duke, David)
August 18, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
August 18, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Staffing Advantage, L.L.C. (Senter, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by David Aaron Senter, Jr on behalf of Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.. (Senter, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5571921.), filed by Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affiliate Program, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons) (Senter, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staffing Advantage, L.L.C. v. Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staffing Advantage, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Aaron Senter, Jr.
Represented By: David M. Duke
Represented By: Kristen MJ Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Definitive Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sophia V. Blair
Represented By: Kevin J. Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?