Salazar et al v. Fields et al
Plaintiff: J C-H, Ms. Luz Huerta Salazar, Mr. Jose F Toribio and J M C-H
Defendant: Mr. James Russell Fields, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Marshals Service and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 7:2020cv00195
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Rudy E. Renfer on behalf of James Russell Fields, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service substituting for Joshua L. Rogers. (Renfer, Rudy)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jose F Toribio served on James Russell Fields, United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service, United States of America on 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Affidavit) (Turlington, David)
November 19, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting the United States' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #16 . The United States has up to and including December 17, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/19/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Jose F Toribio served on James Russell Fields, United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service, United States of America on 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Turlington, David)
November 19, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond up to and including December 17, 2020. (Stouch, L.)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Certification of Scope of Employment and Substitution refiled by AUSA Joshua Royster. (Royster, Joshua)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond up to and including December 17, 2020 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 11/19/2020 to correct event (Hockaday, A.).
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Rogers, Joshua)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Certification of Scope of Employment and Substitution. (Rogers, Joshua)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond up to and including December 17, 2020, #11 Notice of Appearance Withdrawing Docket Entry Numbers 11 and 12. (Rogers, Joshua)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond up to and including December 17, 2020 filed by James Russell Fields. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rogers, Joshua)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of James Russell Fields. (Rogers, Joshua)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luz Huerta Salazar. James Russell Fields served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Turlington, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J C-H. James Russell Fields served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Turlington, David)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/26/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 21, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #2 First MOTION to Appoint Guardian-Mother ad Litem to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem, mother proposed. (Stouch, L.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jose F Toribio (Turlington, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Luz Huerta Salazar (Turlington, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by David F. Turlington on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Turlington, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James Russell Fields, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Department of Justice, United States Marshals Service. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by Luz Huerta Salazar Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons for Fields, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for DOJ, #3 Proposed Summons Summons for USMS, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for USA) (Turlington, David)
October 14, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Luz Huerta Salazar, Jose F Toribio. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION to Appoint Guardian-Mother ad Litem to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem, mother proposed filed by Luz Huerta Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Appoint GAL) (Turlington, David)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT By All Plaintiffs against all Defendants with Exhibit against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number WIL002127), filed by Luz Huerta Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- Letters regarding Tort Claim) (Turlington, David) Modified on 10/14/2020 to describe exhibit. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar et al v. Fields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J C-H
Represented By: David F. Turlington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Luz Huerta Salazar
Represented By: David F. Turlington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose F Toribio
Represented By: David F. Turlington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J M C-H
Represented By: David F. Turlington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. James Russell Fields
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?