Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC v. Therma-Stor, LLC
Plaintiff: Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC
Defendant: Therma-Stor, LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00067
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of mailing of Patent Report to Director of US Patent and Trademark Office. (Collins, S.)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC regarding #3 Notice - other Civil Cover Sheet. (Boyce, R.) Modified on 4/21/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
April 21, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC (Boyce, R.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice filed by Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Boyce, R.)
April 16, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2021 Notice to Counsel. No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
April 16, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by David A. Senter on behalf of Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC. (Senter, David)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5982059.), filed by Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,194,870 (the 870 Patent)) (Boyce, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC v. Therma-Stor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Dehumidifier System, LLC
Represented By: R. Daniel Boyce
Represented By: David A. Senter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therma-Stor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?