Riggs v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Riggs
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 7:2021cv00112
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Stephanie Riggs. Ethicon Inc waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Abuzerr, Fatima)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Stephanie Riggs. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Abuzerr, Fatima)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Stephanie Riggs. (Abuzerr, Fatima)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 Summonses Issued as to Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 Notice filed by Stephanie Riggs regarding #1 Complaint Preposed Summons Johnson and Johnson. (Szymankiewicz, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 Notice filed by Stephanie Riggs regarding #1 Complaint Preposed Summons Ethicon Inc.. (Szymankiewicz, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Riggs (Szymankiewicz, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of Stephanie Riggs. (Szymankiewicz, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Szymankiewicz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Szymankiewicz, John)
June 24, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Notice of Special Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out-of-district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Sellers, N.)
June 17, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Stephanie Riggs. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6096572.), filed by Stephanie Riggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Szymankiewicz, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Riggs
Represented By: John R. Szymankiewicz
Represented By: Fatima Abuzerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?