Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. v. Hot Fish Club, LLC et al
Plaintiff: YACHT BASIN PROVISION COMPANY and Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. d/b/a Provision Company
Defendant: INLET PROVISION COMPANY, Hot Fish Club, LLC d/b/a Inlet Provision Company, Kathy Bates, Phillip Bates and Cyndi Moran
Case Number: 7:2021cv00117
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul H. Derrick on behalf of All Defendants. (Derrick, Paul)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Amended Complaint, filed by Kathy Bates, Phillip Bates, Hot Fish Club, LLC d/b/a Inlet Provision Company, Inlet Provision Company, Cyndi Moran. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time) (Derrick, Paul)
August 16, 2021 Notice to Counsel. Attorney Paul H. Derrick should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
August 16, 2021 Motion Submitted to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Amended Complaint. (Collins, S.)
August 16, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including September 20, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #7 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/16/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. served on Cyndi Moran on 7/29/2021. (Burke, Charles)
August 4, 2021 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. served on Kathy Bates on 7/30/2021. (Burke, Charles)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. served on Phillip Bates on 7/30/2021. (Burke, Charles)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Kathy Bates, Phillip Bates, Hot Fish Club, LLC d/b/a Inlet Provision Company, Cyndi Moran.(*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 Notice filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company Proposed Summons - Cyndi Moran. (Kim, Minnie)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 Notice filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company Proposed Summons - Phillip Bates. (Kim, Minnie)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 Notice filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company Proposed Summons - Kathy Bates. (Kim, Minnie)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 Notice filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company Proposed Summons - Hot Fish Club LLC d/b/a Inlet Provision Company. (Kim, Minnie)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hot Fish Club, LLC d/b/a Inlet Provision Company, Kathy Bates, Phillip Bates, Cyndi Moran, filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Grand Stand Ads, #2 Exhibit B - Grand Stand Locations, #3 Exhibit C - Articles re Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D - 222 Registration) (Kim, Minnie)
July 12, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Minnie Kim on behalf of Yacht Basin Provision Company. (Kim, Minnie)
July 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel. Attorney Minnie Kim should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles A. Burke on behalf of Yacht Basin Provision Company. (Burke, Charles)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Yacht Basin Provision Company (Kim, Minnie)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice filed by Yacht Basin Provision Company JS44 Civil Cover Sheet. (Kim, Minnie)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 TRADEMARK REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on June 29, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
June 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
June 29, 2021 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
June 29, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Yacht Basin Provision Company. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INLET PROVISION COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6113318.), filed by YACHT BASIN PROVISION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Grand Stand Ads, #2 Exhibit B - Grand Stand Locations, #3 Exhibit C - Articles re Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D - 222 Registration) (Kim, Minnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. v. Hot Fish Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YACHT BASIN PROVISION COMPANY
Represented By: Minnie Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yacht Basin Provision Company, Inc. d/b/a Provision Company
Represented By: Charles A. Burke
Represented By: Minnie Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INLET PROVISION COMPANY
Represented By: Paul H. Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Fish Club, LLC d/b/a Inlet Provision Company
Represented By: Paul H. Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Bates
Represented By: Paul H. Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Bates
Represented By: Paul H. Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyndi Moran
Represented By: Paul H. Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?