Johnson et al v. Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC et al
Plaintiff: Skylee Johnson, Tayler Johnson, Scott Johnson, Lindsey Johnson, S.J. and T.J.
Defendant: Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, AMCC Managing Member LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, WR South LLC and Winn Management Group LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00188
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE regarding #37 Notice - other filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Mincey, Patrick)
December 22, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mincey, Patrick)
December 22, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #33 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Waddell, K.)
December 22, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #38 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including January 10, 2022, within which to file their reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss #12 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/22/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
December 20, 2021 Filing 37 Notice filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J. regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery . (Baehr, Kristina)
December 15, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Related Case filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC . (Mincey, Patrick)
December 14, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Related Case filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J. . (Baehr, Kristina)
December 13, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (CORRECTED) filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristina Baehr, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit 1-AMCC Bond Discharge Subcontractor Liens, #4 Exhibit 2-Cancellation of Claim of Lien Real Property, #5 Exhibit 3-Lendlease LLC Annual Report, #6 Exhibit 4-Actus Lendlease LLC Annual Report, #7 Exhibit 5-Memorandum of Real Estate Ground Lease & Conveyance of Facilities, #8 Exhibit 6-AMCC LLC Annual Report, #9 Exhibit 7-Court File Materials (AMCC v. Marshall, 17 CVM 583), #10 Exhibit 8-Court File Materials (AMCC v. Leach, 18 CVM 543), #11 Exhibit 9-Court File Materials (AMCC v. Racey, 17 CVM 1706), #12 Exhibit 10-Court File Materials (AMCC v. Byland, 16 CVM 2374), #13 Exhibit 11-Court File Materials (AMCC v. Nelson, 17 CVM 1773), #14 Exhibit 12-AMCC Guidelines and Policies, #15 Exhibit 13-Memo ISO Consent Motion to Substitute Proper Defendants (Hess v AMCC, No. 7:13-cv-00018), #16 Exhibit 14-Amended Complaint (Hess v AMCC, No. 7:13-cv-00018), #17 Exhibit 15-Answer (Hess v AMCC, No. 7:13-cv-00018), #18 Exhibit 16-Memo ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Hess v AMCC, No. 7:13-cv-00018), #19 Exhibit 17-Declaration of B.K. Cozart, #20 Exhibit 18-Declaration of Cathy Murray (Hess v AMCC, No. 7:13-cv-00018), #21 Exhibit 19-Press Release, #22 Exhibit 20-Lend Lease Investor Tour, #23 Exhibit 21-Hess Deposition Transcript_Excerpts, #24 Exhibit 22-2021 12 01 Baehr email to Klebanov regarding mediation, #25 Exhibit 23-2021 12 08 Baehr_Klebanov email exchange regarding discovery) (Baehr, Kristina)
December 13, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #33 Response in Opposition to Motion. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five exhibits, the first attached exhibit must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. Counsel is directed to refile. (Waddell, K.)
December 10, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristina Baehr, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23) (Baehr, Kristina)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion for Emergency Relief regarding #26 Motion to Stay Discovery. The Motion for Emergency Relief is DENIED to the extent it seeks an immediate emergency ruling on the pending Motion to Stay Discovery. Defendants' motion is GRANTED regarding the Rule 26(f) deadlines, and it is therefore ORDERED that the parties' deadlines for the Rule 26(f) conference and the subsequent filing of a Rule 26(f) report are stayed pending the court's ruling on the Motion to Stay Discovery [DE-26]. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 12/9/2021. Counsel are reminded to read the order in its entirety for other critical information. (Waddell, K.)
December 9, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #29 MOTION for Emergency Relief regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Mincey, Patrick)
December 9, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #29 MOTION for Emergency Relief regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J.. (Baehr, Kristina)
December 9, 2021 Motions Referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery and #29 MOTION for Emergency Relief regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery . (Waddell, K.)
December 9, 2021 Document Referred: #31 Reply to Response referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Waddell, K.)
December 9, 2021 Document Referred: #30 Response in Opposition to #29 Motion for Emergency Relief referred to US Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers. (Waddell, K.)
December 8, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Emergency Relief regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mincey, Patrick)
December 6, 2021 Filing 28 Proposed Order regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Mincey, Patrick)
December 6, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #26 Motion to Stay Discovery. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event "Proposed Order" located in the Responses and Replies category. (Waddell, K.)
December 3, 2021 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support regarding #26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails) (Mincey, Patrick)
December 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Mincey, Patrick)
December 1, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand [Unopposed]. (Waddell, K.)
December 1, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. (Waddell, K.)
December 1, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #25 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiffs have up to and including December 13, 2021, within which to file a motion to remand. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/1/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
November 30, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand [Unopposed] filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Baehr, Kristina)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Local counsel has not signed the motion. Counsel is directed to refile the motion with local counsel's electronic signature. See Local Civil Rule 83.1(d). (Waddell, K.)
November 29, 2021 Filing 24 CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Remand [Unopposed] filed by Lindsey Johnson, Scott Johnson, S.J.(a minor), T.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Baehr, Kristina)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/29/2021. (Waddell, K.)
November 29, 2021 Filing 22 Proposed Order regarding #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Memorandum in Support,, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lindsey Johnson. (Perry, Michael)
November 29, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Waddell, K.)
November 29, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Waddell, K.)
November 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Perry, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kristina S. Baehr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Baehr, Kristina)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Hal J. Perloff on behalf of All Defendants. (Perloff, Hal)
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael Klebanov on behalf of All Defendants. (Klebanov, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Scott Johnson (Perry, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lindsey Johnson (Perry, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael K. Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Perry, Michael)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/9/2021. (Copy of order sent to Holden K. McLemore, Michael K. Perry & Trevor D. Brandt of Perry & Brandt, Attorneys At Law at P. O. Box 2108, Wake Forest, NC 27588 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
November 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #13 Memorandum in Support. All counsel appearing on behalf of a party must file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) and should not sign documents and pleadings filed with the court until such time. (Waddell, K.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Phillip Carpenter, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Phillip Carpenter, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Patrick Appleby, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Patrick Appleby, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Patrick Appleby, #7 Exhibit F - Lease Agreement) (Mincey, Patrick)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC, WR South LLC, Winn Management Group LLC. (Mincey, Patrick)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 Notice regarding 1 Notice of Removal requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Holden K. McLemore, Michael K. Perry & Trevor D. Brandt of Perry & Brandt, Attorneys At Law at P. O. Box 2108, Wake Forest, NC 27588 mailed via US Mail on November 2, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Winn Management Group LLC (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by AMCC Property Management LLC (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by AMCC Managing Member LLC (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Jenkins Bell on behalf of All Defendants. (Bell, Stephen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Melton Mincey on behalf of All Defendants. (Mincey, Patrick)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Winn Management Group LLC, AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, WR South LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC from Onslow, case number 21 CVS 3124. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6298360), filed by Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC, Winn Management Group LLC, AMCC Managing Member LLC, AMCC Property Management LLC, Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC, WR South LLC, Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal, Jarman v. Beaufort-Jasper Water & Sewer Authority, #4 Exhbit 4 - Notice of Removal, Whatley v. Atlantic Marine Corps. Communities, LLC, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Notice of Filing/Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Mincey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayler Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Michael K. Perry
Represented By: Kristina S. Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Johnson
Represented By: Michael K. Perry
Represented By: Kristina S. Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.J.
Represented By: Michael K. Perry
Represented By: Kristina S. Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J.
Represented By: Michael K. Perry
Represented By: Kristina S. Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendlease (US) Public Partnerships Holdings LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCC Managing Member LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Marine Corps Communities LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCC Property Management LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WR South LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn Management Group LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jenkins Bell
Represented By: Patrick Melton Mincey
Represented By: Hal J. Perloff
Represented By: Michael Klebanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?