Grant Love v. Southeastern Hospital
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Grant Love
Defendant: Southeastern Hospital
Case Number: 7:2021cv00190
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T. Grant Love returned - Released or Transferred - No forwarding address. (Castania, M)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel T. Grant Love (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The clerk is DIRECTED to docket in 7:21-CV-164-FL the documents located at docket entries 1 and 2 in 7:21-CV-190-FL. The court REFERS 7:21-CV-164-FL to United States Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers for initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The clerk is further DIRECTED to docket this order in both actions, to administratively close 7:21-CV-190-FL as opened in error, and to send plaintiff the form financial disclosure statement. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete that form and return it to the court within 21 days of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/18/2021. A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Daniel T. Grant Love, 1834497, Pinellas County Jail, 14400 49th Street North, Clearwater, FL 33762 (Collins, S.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER. This case is reassigned to the Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Richard E. Myers II is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents should reflect the revised case number of 7:21-CV-190-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/5/2021. (Copy of order sent to Daniel T. Grant Love, 1834497, Pinellas County Jail, 14400 49th Street North, Clearwater, FL 33762 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
November 3, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Daniel T. Grant Love. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Daniel T. Grant Love. (Rudd, D.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Daniel T. Grant Love. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant Love v. Southeastern Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Grant Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?