Antoine v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Antoinette Renee Antoine
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 7:2021cv00219
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons & Complaint filed by Antoinette Renee Antoine served on U.S. Attorney Michael F. Easley, Jr. on 12/30/2021. (Gillespie, Michael)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Summons & Complaint filed by Antoinette Renee Antoine served on Office of the General Counsel on 01/04/2022. (Gillespie, Michael)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons & Complaint filed by Antoinette Renee Antoine served on Attorney General Merrick Garland on 01/08/2022. (Gillespie, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice filed by Antoinette Renee Antoine regarding #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons for Office of the Program Law, Office of the General Counsel. (Gillespie, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Notice of Social Security Case Filing (Sellers, N.)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Antoinette Renee Antoine (Gillespie, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Gray Gillespie on behalf of Antoinette Renee Antoine. (Gillespie, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6368925.), filed by Antoinette Renee Antoine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for U.S. Attorney Michael J. Easley, Jr., #3 Proposed Summons for Attorney General Merrick Garland, #4 Proposed Summons for Office of the Program Law, Office of the General Counsel) (Gillespie, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoine v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Renee Antoine
Represented By: Michael Gray Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?