Suarez v. Southern Carlson
Plaintiff: Joaquin Suarez
Defendant: Southern Carlson, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2022cv00021
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #7 Complaint,,, by Southern Carlson, Inc.. (Schenk, Edward)
April 20, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Margaret C. Hershiser on behalf of Southern Carlson, Inc.. (Hershiser, Margaret)
April 20, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Patrice D. Ott on behalf of Southern Carlson, Inc.. (Ott, Patrice)
April 20, 2022 Filing 16 Notice filed by Southern Carlson, Inc. regarding #11 Notice of Appearance Amended Notice - 83.1(d) Local Counsel. (Schenk, Edward)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Southern Carlson, Inc. answer due 5/9/2022. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/14/2022. Sent to Joaquin Suarez at 309 Foxwood Ln. Wilmington, NC 28409 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Southern Carlson, Inc. on 3/28/2022. (Sellers, N.)
April 14, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead. (Sellers, N.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Southern Carlson, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kyocera Industrial Tool, Inc. for Southern Carlson, Inc.. (Schenk, Edward)
April 13, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #7 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Plead filed by Southern Carlson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Schenk, Edward)
April 13, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Edward S. Schenk on behalf of Southern Carlson, Inc.. (Schenk, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Southern Carlson, Inc. (Sellers, N.)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Southern Carlson, Inc., filed by Joaquin Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Suit Rights, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated 12/8/2020 to Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, #3 Exhibit 3 - Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email from US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission dated 7/23/2021, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Joaquin Suarez dated 9/6/2021, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez regarding Sean, Kevin, and Joe, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter to Joaquin Suarez dated 4/23/2020 from Southern Carlson, Inc., #10 Exhibit 10 - Separation agreement and general release, #11 Exhibit 11 - Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez) (Sellers, N.)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/11/2022. Sent to Joaquin Suarez at 309 Foxwood Ln. Wilmington, NC 28409 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
March 11, 2022 Remark: Certified copy of #6 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joaquin Suarez. (Sellers, N.)
February 24, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joaquin Suarez. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO PARTICULARIZE his application no later than March 14, 2022. If he fails to do so, the clerk shall close the case without further order from the court. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/11/2022. Sent to Joaquin Suarez at 309 Foxwood Ln. Wilmington, NC 28409 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 7, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Joaquin Suarez. (Rudd, D.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Joaquin Suarez. (Rudd, D.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Joaquin Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1- Notice of Suit Rights, #3 Exhibit 2- Letter dated 12/8/2020 to EEOC, #4 Exhibit 3- Charge of Discrimination, #5 Exhibit 4- Email from U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission dated 7/23/2021, #6 Exhibit 5- Letter from Joaquin Suarez dated 9/6/2021, #7 Exhibit 6- Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez, #8 Exhibit 7- Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez, #9 Exhibit 8- Email dated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez regarding Sean, Kevin and Joe, #10 Exhibit Letter to Joaquin Suarez dated 4/23/2020 from Southern Carlson, #11 Exhibit 10- Separation Agreement and General Release, #12 Exhibit 11- Email ated 12/22/2020 to Arely Tochez from Joaquin Suarez, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suarez v. Southern Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Carlson, Inc.
Represented By: Edward S. Schenk
Represented By: Margaret C. Hershiser
Represented By: Patrice D. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?