Malafronte v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Victor A. Malafronte
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: Wallace and Graham, P.A.
Amicus Curiae: Bell Legal Group LLC
Case Number: 7:2022cv00168
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Robert T Numbers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Filing 25 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Ronald Lasorsa. (Sellers, N.)
February 6, 2023 Filing 24 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Ronald Lasorsa. (Stouch, L.)
January 30, 2023 Filing 23 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the motion to dismiss [DE 16] is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/30/2023. (Stouch, L.)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File and denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 United States v. Pugh, No. 7:22-CV-124-BO-BM Order) (Stouch, L.)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER taken under advisement regarding #10 Response. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/14/2022. (Reznick, Debra)
December 14, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected 2d Russell Declaration (Nov. 10 2022)) (Bain, John)
December 14, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Reznick, Debra)
November 30, 2022 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Victor A. Malafronte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-May 20, 2022 Navy Website Evidencing Blanket Denial Of Claims, #2 Exhibit 2-Victor A. Malafronte Standard Form 95, #3 Exhibit 3-January 25, 2019 Department of the Navy Denial Letter) (Dowling, William)
November 21, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Haroon Anwar on behalf of United States of America. (Anwar, Haroon)
November 14, 2022 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Randall Russell with attachments) (Bain, John)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Bain, John)
November 9, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Joel R. Rhine on behalf of Wallace and Graham, P.A.. (Rhine, Joel)
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Mona Lisa Wallace on behalf of Wallace and Graham, P.A.. (Wallace, Mona)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Wallace and Graham, P.A.. (Wallace, Mona)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Wallace and Graham, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order) (Wallace, Mona)
October 27, 2022 Remark - #10 Response and #11 Brief submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Stouch, L.)
October 19, 2022 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Bell Legal Group LLC. (Flynn, Eric)
October 19, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Order regarding #9 Order,, STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.1(e)(5) filed by Victor A. Malafronte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-DECLARATION OF ZINA BASH IN SUPPORT OF STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.1(e)(5), #2 Exhibit 2-LOCAL COUNSEL STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ZINA BASH, WARREN POSTMAN, AND KELLER POSTMAN LLC) (Bash, Zina)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDICIAL PREFERENCE ORDER - In all actions assigned to the undersigned, the Clerk of Court shall cause a copy of this order to be filed in any case in which it appears that the rules pertaining to special appearances in this district by non-admitted counsel as outlined in Local Civil Rule 83.l(e)(5) and Local Criminal Rule 57.1 (e)(5) have been violated. Upon the filing of this order, counsel appearing by special appearance shall show cause within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of the order why counsel should not be removed from the case for violation of the Court's Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/4/2022. (Stouch, L.)
September 29, 2022 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Victor A. Malafronte served on Attorney General of the United States on September 21, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Dowling, William)
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service filed by Victor A. Malafronte as to United States of America served on 9/14/2022, answer due 11/13/2022. (Dowling, William)
September 15, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Bain on behalf of United States of America. (Bain, John)
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Warren D. Postman on behalf of Victor A. Malafronte. (Postman, Warren)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Victor A. Malafronte. (Bash, Zina)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Attorney General, US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 14, 2022 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that when the cause of action is 804 that the Nature of Suit should be 360 (P.I.: Other). No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
September 14, 2022 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance or Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) and 83.1(e). (Rudd, D.)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Victor A. Malafronte (Dowling, William)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6725968.), filed by Victor A. Malafronte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Attorney General of the United States, #3 Proposed Summons to United States Attorney Michael F. Easley, Jr.) (Dowling, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malafronte v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor A. Malafronte
Represented By: William Michael Dowling
Represented By: Warren D. Postman
Represented By: Zina Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John A. Bain
Represented By: Haroon Anwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bell Legal Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wallace and Graham, P.A.
Represented By: Joel R. Rhine
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?