The Estate of Joseph Whitlock Smith v. United States of America
Plaintiff: The Estate of Joseph Whitlock Smith
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2023cv01078
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Robert T Numbers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
June 29, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7135939.), filed by The Estate of Joseph Whitlock Smith. (Byrd, Wade)
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division to Southern Division. This case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future filings should reflect the new case number of 7:23-CV-1078-BO-RN. No further filing shall be made in 4:23-CV-BO-RN. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/20/2023. (Stouch, L.)
June 20, 2023 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
June 20, 2023 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Counsel failed to indicate the date of signature in the designated space just above the signature block. Counsel is directed to refile the document. (Rudd, D.)
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by JoAnne S Smith (Byrd, Wade)
June 13, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wade E. Byrd on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Byrd, Wade)
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7135939.), filed by Joseph Whitlock Smith, JoAnne S Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Byrd, Wade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Joseph Whitlock Smith v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Joseph Whitlock Smith
Represented By: Wade E. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?