Britt-Johnson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Patricia Britt-Johnson
Defendant: United States of America
Interested Party: Torts Branch USDOJ
Case Number: 7:2024cv00362
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sara Johanna Mirsky on behalf of United States of America. (Mirsky, Sara)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Karl J. Protil, Jr on behalf of Patricia Britt-Johnson. (Protil, Karl)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit of Karl Protil filed by Patricia Britt-Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt) (Poulin, Eric)
May 1, 2024 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Karl Protil, Jr. must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/1/2024. (Reznick, Debra)
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Patricia Britt-Johnson. (Poulin, Eric) .
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by PATRICA BRITT-JOHNSON (Poulin, Eric)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric M. Poulin on behalf of PATRICA BRITT-JOHNSON. (Poulin, Eric)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7577774.), filed by PATRICA BRITT-JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Poulin, Eric)
April 23, 2024 NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
April 23, 2024 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Pursuant to In Re: Camp Lejeune Water Litigation, Master Docket 7:23-cv-897, Case Management Order No. 10, all Plaintiffs must file a Short-Form complaint within 30 days of the date their initial complaint was filed. (Carter, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt-Johnson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Britt-Johnson
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Karl J. Protil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Charles Eagles
Represented By: Sara Johanna Mirsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Torts Branch USDOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?