ROI Industries Group, Inc.
Debtor: ROI Industries Group, Inc.
Administrator: William P. Miller
Trustee: James Charles White
Case Number: 1:2021bk80134
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Benjamin A Kahn
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 71 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/1/2021 10:05:01 AM ]. File Size [ 2722 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:34 ]. (*46* Status Conference). (admin).
June 1, 2021 Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: 6/1/21 Appearances: J.P. Cournoyer, James White, Sarah Bruce, Kevin Saylor (President) present (RE: related document(s)#46 Status Conference, ORDERED: Concluded (Champagne, K.)
June 1, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 69 Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#15 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V, #59 Amended Schedules). (Cournoyer, John)
June 1, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#46 Order and Notice of Section 1188 Status Conference) (Champagne, K.)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order Granting Application to Employ Nelson & Company, P.A. as Accountant. (Related Doc #35) (Shoffner, T.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 67 Consultants Report Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Miller, William)
May 21, 2021 Filing 66 Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) , #48 Order on Motion for Continuation of Utility Service). (Cournoyer, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 65 Withdrawal of Document Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#62 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address). (Cournoyer, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 64 Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 7 - 30, 2021 Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
May 20, 2021 Filing 63 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#60 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) Notice Date 05/20/2021. (Admin.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 62 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by obo Spectrum Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
May 18, 2021 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel C. Bruton Filed by Creditor Industrial Design & Fabrication, Inc.. (Bruton, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Granting Amended Motion by Dana L. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice Local Counsel: Mignon A. Lunsford Filed by Creditor Valassis Manufacturing Company. (Related Doc #56) (Shoffner, T.)
May 17, 2021 Filing 59 Amended Schedules-Statements filed: Schedule E/F,to Add Creditor; Summary of Assets and Liabilities,Amending Schedule E/F;. Fee Amount $32. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
May 17, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules(# 21-80134) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00). Receipt number A9404171, amount $ 32.00. (re: Doc#59) (U.S. Treasury)
May 14, 2021 Filing 58 Section 1188(c) Status Conference Report (Subchapter V) Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
May 14, 2021 Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors 5/14/2021 Held (Miller, William)
May 13, 2021 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#55 Order on Application to Employ) Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.)
May 12, 2021 Filing 56 Amended Motion by Dana L. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice Local Counsel: Mignon A. Lunsford Filed by Creditor Valassis Manufacturing Company. (Lunsford, Mignon)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Granting Amended Application to Employ John Paul H. Cournoyer and the firm of Northen Blue, LLP as Counsel for Debtor. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (Related Doc #13) (Shoffner, T.)
May 4, 2021 Filing 54 Motion by Dana L. Robbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice Local Counsel: Mignon A. Lunsford Filed by Creditor Valassis Manufacturing Company. (Lunsford, Mignon)
May 4, 2021 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mignon Arrington Lunsford Filed by Creditor Valassis Manufacturing Company. (Lunsford, Mignon)
April 23, 2021 Filing 52 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#48 Order on Motion for Continuation of Utility Service) Notice Date 04/23/2021. (Admin.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by Filed by Creditor South East Manufacturing, Inc. d/b/a Barnes Metalcrafters. (Russell, Tyler)
April 21, 2021 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#46 Order and Notice of Section 1188 Status Conference) Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.)
April 21, 2021 Filing 49 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#45 Order on Motion to Pay Employees) Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.)
April 21, 2021 Filing 48 Interim Order Finding Utilities Adequately Assured of Payment and Establishing Further Procedures Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 366. If an objection to the Motion is timely filed, or if a Request to Approve Additional Assurance is timely filed, a final hearing will be held on June 1, 2021 at 9:30 a.m.(Related Doc #8) (Shoffner, T.)
April 21, 2021 Filing 47 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order and Notice of Section 1188 Status Conference. The person designated to act on behalf of the debtor must appear at the Status Conference unless otherwise directed by the Court... Conference scheduled 6/1/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Shoffner, T.)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion To Pay Employees. The Motion is granted with respect to the request to pay accrued employee-related obligations. The Motion is denied with respect to the request to pay accrued pre-petition obligations to independent contractors. (Related Doc #10) (Shoffner, T.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 44 Designation of Depository: First Horizon, 1821 Hillandale Rd., Durham, NC 27705. (Shoffner, T.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 43 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#13 Amended Application to Employ John Paul H. Cournoyer and the firm of Northen Blue, LLP as Counsel for Debtor ). (Cournoyer, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 42 Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations, and Profitability of Entities in which the Estate of the Debtor Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest (FRBP 2015.3) Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 41 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 18, 2021 Filing 40 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing (RE: related document(s)#36 Notice of Tentative Hearing) Notice Date 04/18/2021. (Admin.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas C. Wolff Filed by Creditor South East Manufacturing, Inc. d/b/a Barnes Metalcrafters. (Wolff, Thomas)
April 16, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Tyler J. Russell Filed by Creditor South East Manufacturing, Inc. d/b/a Barnes Metalcrafters. (Russell, Tyler)
April 16, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 16, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Tentative Hearing . (RE: related document(s)#35 Application to Employ Lehman B. Pollard and the firm of Nelson & Company, PA as Accountant. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.) Objections are due 5/9/2021. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM for #35, (Shoffner, T.)
April 15, 2021 Filing 35 Application to Employ Lehman B. Pollard and the firm of Nelson & Company, PA as Accountant Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 14, 2021 Filing 34 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/14/2021 9:51:36 AM ]. File Size [ 14281 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:39:40 ]. (*8* Motion to Pay Utilities). (admin).
April 14, 2021 Filing 33 Amended Document Voluntary Petition Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Cournoyer, John)
April 14, 2021 Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: 4/14/21. Appearances: JP Cournoyer, James White, Sarah Bruce, Kevin Saylor (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion by Debtor for Continuation of Utility Services and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Companies, ORDERED: Granted, In the event there are timely objections filed, hearing to be set 5/18/21 @ 9:30 a.m. #10 Emergency Motion by Debtor to Pay Employees and Related Payroll Taxes, Independent Contractor Obligations and Employee Benefits, ORDERED: Granting in Part Denying in Part, O: Trustee (Davis, S.)
April 14, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc., #10 Motion to Pay Employees filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.) (Davis, S.)
April 13, 2021 Filing 32 Exhibit Designation April 14, 2021 Virtual Hearing Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 13, 2021 Filing 31 Remote Witness Designation April 14, 2021 Virtual Hearing. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 12, 2021 Filing 30 Trustee Bond. Filed by Trustee James Charles White. (White, James)
April 12, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Disputed, Contingent or Unliquidated Claims Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 Disclosure of Officer Compensation. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 11, 2021 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#20 Designating Party to Act on behalf of Corp/Partnership) Notice Date 04/11/2021. (Admin.)
April 11, 2021 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing (RE: related document(s)#18 Notice of Tentative Hearing) Notice Date 04/11/2021. (Admin.)
April 10, 2021 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#15 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Subchapter V) Notice Date 04/10/2021. (Admin.)
April 10, 2021 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#5 Missing Documents Due:) Notice Date 04/10/2021. (Admin.)
April 10, 2021 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#6 Missing Documents Due:) Notice Date 04/10/2021. (Admin.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#4 Chapter 11 Operating Order) Notice Date 04/09/2021. (Admin.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 21 Response to (related document(s): #10 Emergency Motion to Pay Employees and Related Payroll Taxes, Independent Contractor Obligations and Employee Benefits. filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (Miller, William)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Designating Kevin Saylor to Act on behalf of ROI Industries Group, Inc. (Shoffner, T.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 19 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) , #10 Emergency Motion to Pay Employees and Related Payroll Taxes, Independent Contractor Obligations and Employee Benefits., #16 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Cournoyer, John)
April 9, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Tentative Hearing . (RE: related document(s)#13 Amended Application to Employ John Paul H. Cournoyer and the firm of Northen Blue, LLP as Counsel for Debtor. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.) Objections are due 5/2/2021. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 5/6/2021 at 02:00 PM for #13, (Shoffner, T.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 17 Supplemental Certificate of Service to serve the additional parties by US Mail Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (RE: related document(s)#14 Notice of Subchapter V Trustee Appointment). (Miller, William)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service, #10 Motion to Pay Employees). Hearing Scheduled 4/14/21 at 9:30 a.m. to be held ZFG. (Shoffner, T.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 Meeting of Creditors for Chapter 11 Subchapter V 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM. Proofs of Claims due by 6/16/2021. (Shoffner, T.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Subchapter V Trustee Appointment James C. White. Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Disinterested Parties)(Miller, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 Amended Application to Employ John Paul H. Cournoyer and the firm of Northen Blue, LLP as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Kevin Saylor. [Regarding Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, and Cash-Flow Statement] Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 Emergency Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service, #10 Motion to Pay Employees) Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 Emergency Motion to Pay Employees and Related Payroll Taxes, Independent Contractor Obligations and Employee Benefits. Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Application to Employ John Paul H. Cournoyer and the firm of Northen Blue, LLP as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 Missing Documents Due: Incomplete Filings due by 4/14/2021. SB Balance Sheet: 4/14/2021. SB Cash Flow Statement: 4/14/2021. SB Statement of Operations Due: 4/14/2021. Federal Tax Return: 4/14/2021. (Shoffner, T.)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Missing Documents Due: Atty Fee Disclosure Statement due 4/21/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/21/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Officers Partners Directors and Members due 4/21/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 4/21/2021. (Shoffner, T.)
April 8, 2021 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc., #10 Motion to Pay Employees filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 4/14/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Shoffner, T.)
April 8, 2021 The Bankruptcy Administrator gives notice that the BA has reviewed the related document, and has no objection. The BA does not wish to be heard as to the relief requested. The BA comments: . Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (RE: related document(s)#8 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.). (Miller, William)
April 8, 2021 The Bankruptcy Administrator gives notice that the BA has reviewed the related document, and has no objection. The BA does not wish to be heard as to the relief requested. The BA comments: . Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (RE: related document(s)#13 Amended Application to Employ John Paul H. Cournoyer and the firm of Northen Blue, LLP as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.). (Miller, William)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Chapter 11 Operating Order. (Shoffner, T.)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Shoffner, T.)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor ROI Industries Group, Inc.. (Cournoyer, John)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by ROI Industries Group, Inc. (Cournoyer, John)
April 7, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-80134) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A9362055, amount $1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: ROI Industries Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: ROI Industries Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Paul H. Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Administrator: William P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: James Charles White
Represented By: James C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?