Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.
Debtor: Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.
Administrator: William P. Miller
Case Number: 2:2021bk10222
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Lena M James
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 113 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#112 Order on Motion to Establish Procedures, Order on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)). (Lanik, James)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order (A) Authorizing and Scheduling an Auction for the Sale of the Sale Assets, (B) Approving Bidding Procedures, (C) Approving Procedures for the Assumption and Assignment of Contracts and Leases, (D) Authorizing the Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder(s) and Approving Break-Up Fees, (E) Approving the Form and Manner of Certain Notices, and (F) Setting a Date for the Sale Hearing (Related Doc #96). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bidding Procedures #2 Exhibit Sale Notice #3 Exhibit Assignment Notice). The hearing to consider the sale of the Sale Assets, including any proposed assumption and assignment of executory contracts and unexpired leasesand the Cure Amounts related thereto, shall be held on 8/6/21 at 9:30 a.m., Courtroom Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.)
June 13, 2021 Filing 111 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#110 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 06/13/2021. (Admin.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 110 Final Order Granting Utilities Adequately Assured of Payment and Establishing Further Procedures Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 366. (Related Doc #7) (Whitesell, S.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 109 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/10/2021 11:00:07 AM ]. File Size [ 26621 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:13:57 ]. (*96* Motion by Debtor to Establish Procedures and Motion to Sell all Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)). (admin).
June 10, 2021 Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: 06/10/2021. Appearances: James Lanik and Evan Lee for Debtor, William Miller for BA, James Hundley Debtor, Mr. Hallman Debtors personal Attorney, Dan Bruton for Truist Bank (RE: related document(s)#96 Motion to Establish Procedures filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc., Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)- Motion Granted, O: Trustee (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
June 10, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#96 Motion to Establish Procedures filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
June 9, 2021 Filing 108 Supplemental DocumentAmended Exhibit A - Proposed Sale Procedures Order Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#96 Motion to Establish Procedures , Motion to Sell Substantially All Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) . Fee Amount $188). (Lanik, James)
June 9, 2021 Filing 107 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
June 8, 2021 Filing 106 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James R. Hundley Filed by Creditor Hallman Properties, LLC. (Hundley, James)
June 2, 2021 Filing 105 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#103 Supplemental Document). (Lanik, James)
June 2, 2021 Filing 104 Objection to (related document(s): #96 Motion to Establish Procedures filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc., Motion to Sell Substantially All Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) . Fee Amount $188) Filed by Creditor Truist Bank (Bruton, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 103 Second Supplemental Document - Declaration of James C. Lanik Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#49 Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor ). (Lanik, James)
May 28, 2021 Filing 102 Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 23 through April 30, 2021 Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
May 27, 2021 Filing 101 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#96 Motion to Establish Procedures , Motion to Sell Substantially All Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) . Fee Amount $188, #97 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #96 Motion to Establish Procedures, Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)) , #100 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (RE: related document(s)#96 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Orders (A) Authorizing and Scheduling an Auction for the Sale of the Sale Assets, (B) Approving Bidding Procedures, (C) Approving Procedures for the Assumption and Assignment of Contracts and Leases; (D) Authorizing the Debtor to Designate Stalking Horse Bidders and Approving Break-Up Fees, (E) Approving the Form and Manner of Certain Notices, (F) Setting a Date for the Sale Hearing, (G) Approving the Sale of the Sale Assets to the Highest or Best Bidder, and (H) Granting Related Relief.) Responses Due: no later than 12:00 p.m. on 6/9/21. Hearing Scheduled 6/10/21 at 11:00 a.m., Courtroom Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.)
May 27, 2021 Hearing Set (RE: related document #96 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Orders (A) Authorizing and Scheduling an Auction for the Sale of the Sale Assets, (B) Approving Bidding Procedures, (C) Approving Procedures for the Assumption and Assignment of Contracts and Leases; (D) Authorizing the Debtor to Designate Stalking Horse Bidders and Approving Break-Up Fees, (E) Approving the Form and Manner of Certain Notices, (F) Setting a Date for the Sale Hearing, (G) Approving the Sale of the Sale Assets to the Highest or Best Bidder, and (H) Granting Related Relief. Hearing scheduled 6/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.)
May 26, 2021 Filing 99 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#94 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/26/2021. (Admin.)
May 26, 2021 Filing 98 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#93 Order on Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral) Notice Date 05/26/2021. (Admin.)
May 26, 2021 Filing 97 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #96 Motion to Establish Procedures, Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)) Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 26, 2021 Filing 96 Motion to Establish Procedures , Motion to Sell Substantially All Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) . Fee Amount $188 Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 26, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)(# 21-10222) [motion,sell] ( 188.00). Receipt number A9414690, amount $ 188.00. (re: Doc#96) (U.S. Treasury)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File April 2021 Monthly Operating Report up to and including 5/28/21.Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc (Related Doc #86) (Whitesell, S.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 94 Second Interim Order Granting in Part, Continuing in Part Motion (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pusuant to Section 364 (c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B)Scheduling Final Hearing Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001 to 6/24/21 at 9:30 am in Greensboro. (Related Doc #17) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Whitesell, S.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 93 Second Interim Order Granting in Part, Continuing in Part Motion To Prohibit Cash Collateral to 6/24/21 at 9:30 Greensboro. (Related Doc #28) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Whitesell, S.)
May 24, 2021 Filing 92 Debtor's Disclosure of Officer and Director Retention and Compensation. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#3 Chapter 11 Operating Order). (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 24, 2021 Filing 91 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
May 24, 2021 Filing 90 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/20/2021 2:03:25 PM ]. File Size [ 24571 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:08:15 ]. (1. *17* Emergency Motion by Debtor for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing The Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and). (admin).
May 23, 2021 Filing 89 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#87 Order on Application to Employ) Notice Date 05/23/2021. (Admin.)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order Granting Amended Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc (Related Doc #50) (Whitesell, S.)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order Granting Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc(Related Doc #49) (Whitesell, S.)
May 21, 2021 Filing 86 Motion to Extend Time to File April 2021 Monthly Operating Report Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 20, 2021 Filing 85 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#78 Notice (Generic)) Notice Date 05/20/2021. (Admin.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 84 Exhibit Debtor's Amended Exhibits 1, 4.A., and 6.A. for May 20, 2021 Hearing Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#82 Exhibit). (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 20, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#27 B.A. Motion for Status Conference filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
May 20, 2021 Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#17 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Hearing to be held on 6/24/2021 at 09:30 AM Courtroom #3, Greensboro for #17, (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
May 20, 2021 Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Truist Bank) Hearing to be held on 6/24/2021 at 09:30 AM Courtroom #3, Greensboro for #28, (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
May 20, 2021 Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: 05/20/2021. Appearances: Jennifer Lyday and Evan Lee for Debtor, William Miller for BA, Scott Wilson of Truist Bank, Daniel Bruton and Wrennie Pitt for Truist Bank, Richard Hallman President and CEO of EDM, Hank Waida managing director for SC&H Group, LLC, Edward Hill of Truist Bank (RE: related document(s)#17 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.-Granted and Continued to 06/24/2021, #27 B.A. Motion for Status Conference filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller-Held #28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Truist Bank - Granted and Continued to 06/24/2021 #49 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.- Approved #50 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.- Approved, O:Jennifer Lyday (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
May 20, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#50 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
May 20, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#49 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
May 19, 2021 Filing 83 Supplemental Document - Declaration of James C. Lanik Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#49 Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor ). (Lanik, James)
May 19, 2021 Filing 82 Exhibit 1-10 for Hearing on May 20, 2021 Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 19, 2021 Filing 81 Notice of of Witness for Hearing on May 20, 2021 B. Hallman. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 19, 2021 The Bankruptcy Administrator gives notice that the BA has reviewed the related document, and has no objection. The BA does not wish to be heard as to the relief requested. The BA comments: . Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (RE: related document(s)#49 Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.). (Miller, William)
May 18, 2021 Filing 80 Notice of of Witness for Hearing on May 20, 2021 H. Waida. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 18, 2021 Filing 79 Notice of of Witness for Hearing on May 20, 2021 H. Hallman. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 18, 2021 Filing 78 Letter from Clerk's Office to AzCoat Inc. regarding correspondence. (RE: related document #77 Correspondence from AzCoat Inc.) (Shoffner, T.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 76 Notice of Change of Creditor(s)' Address filed by Crown Roll Leaf, Inc. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
May 17, 2021 Filing 77 Correspondence from AzCoat Inc. (Shoffner, T.)
May 17, 2021 Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors 5/17/2021 Held (Miller, William)
May 16, 2021 Filing 75 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#73 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules) Notice Date 05/16/2021. (Admin.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order Establishing Procedures for Hearing Scheduling for May 20, 2021. (Whitesell, S.)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information up to and including 5/13/21. (Related Doc #63) (Whitesell, S.)
May 13, 2021 Filing 72 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual-Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtor(s) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Exhibit Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
May 13, 2021 Filing 71 Designation of Depository: Truist Bank, 620 N. Main St., High Point, NC 27760. (Whitesell, S.)
May 11, 2021 Filing 70 Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations, and Profitability of Entities in which the Estate of the Debtor Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest (FRBP 2015.3) Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 69 Bankruptcy Administrator's Memo Regarding No Formation of Creditors Committee Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Miller, William)
May 10, 2021 Filing 68 Objection to (related document(s): #50 Amended Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (Miller, William)
May 7, 2021 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Tentative Hearing (RE: related document(s)#64 Notice of Tentative Hearing) Notice Date 05/07/2021. (Admin.)
May 5, 2021 Filing 66 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#60 Notice (Generic)) Notice Date 05/05/2021. (Admin.)
May 5, 2021 Filing 65 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#61 Order and Notice of Hearing) Notice Date 05/05/2021. (Admin.)
May 5, 2021 Filing 64 Notice Of Tentative Hearing . (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information up to and including 5/13/21. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Objections are due 5/12/2021. If an objection is filed, a hearing will be held on 5/20/2021 at 09:30 AM for #63, (Whitesell, S.)
May 4, 2021 Filing 63 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lyday, Jennifer)
May 4, 2021 Filing 62 Supplemental Certificate of Service to add an additional party to serve Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (RE: related document(s)#61 Order and Notice of Hearing). (Miller, William)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order and Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)#27 B.A. Motion for Status Conference filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller). Hearing scheduled 5/20/2021 at 02:00 PM. TAKE FURTHER NOTICE THAT the hearing will proceed virtually via Zoom for Government. The Court will enter a separate order providing virtual hearing procedures prior to the May 20, 2021 hearing. (Whitesell, S.)
May 3, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)#49 Application Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor., #50 Amended Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor.) (Shoffner, T.) Hearing Scheduled 5/20/21 at 2:00 p.m.
May 3, 2021 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#49 Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc., #50 Amended Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 5/20/2021 at 02:00 PM. (Shoffner, T.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 59 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#48 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 58 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#47 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#46 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 56 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#45 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 55 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#44 Order on Generic Motion) Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
May 2, 2021 Filing 54 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#43 Order on Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral) Notice Date 05/02/2021. (Admin.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 53 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2021 10:42:56 AM ]. File Size [ 36239 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:40:40 ]. (1. *5* Emergency Motion by Debtor for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and Waiving Investment and Deposit Guidelines of). (admin).
April 30, 2021 Filing 52 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#50 Amended Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor ). (Lanik, James)
April 30, 2021 Filing 51 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#49 Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor ). (Lanik, James)
April 30, 2021 Filing 50 Amended Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 30, 2021 Filing 49 Amended Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Granting Motion for Debtor's Payment of Pre-Petition (A) Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Claims, (B) Employee Expenses, (C) Funds Deducted and Withheld from Payroll, and (D) Contributions and Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans. (Related Doc #8) (Shoffner, T.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 47 Interim Order Finding Utilities Adequately Assured of Payment and Establishing Further Procedures Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 366. (Related Doc #7) If an objection to the Motion is timely filed, or if a Request to Approve Additional Assurance is timely filed, a final hearing will be held 6/10/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Shoffner, T.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Motion for Payment of Pre-Petition Obligations Owing in Respect to Debtor's Insurance Policies. (Related Doc #6) (Shoffner, T.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting Motion to Authorize the Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System. (Related Doc #5) (Shoffner, T.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 44 Interim Order Granting the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001. (Related Doc #17) A further hearing is scheduled 5/20/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Shoffner, T.)
April 30, 2021 Filing 43 Interim Order Granting Authority to Use Cash Collateral. (Related Doc #28) A further interim hearing is scheduled 5/20/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Shoffner, T.)
April 29, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#7 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#6 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#5 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#8 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Truist Bank) Hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 02:00 PM for #28, (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#17 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 02:00 PM for #17, (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 29, 2021 Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: 04/29/2021. Appearances: James Lanik for Debtor, William Miller BA, Jim Hundle H. Richard Hallman/President of DIP and Brian Hallman, Scott Wilson and Edward Hill for Truist Bank, John Magee for Aurora Management Partners, Daniel Bruton and Wrennie Pitt for Truist Bank (RE: related document(s)#5 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.-GRANTED #6 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.- GRANTED #7 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.- GRANTED on Interim Basis with Tentitive Hearing #8 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.- Granted #17 Generic Motion filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.- GRANTED on Interim Basis, Hearing Continued to 05/20/2021 at 2:00 #28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Truist Bank - GRANTED on Interim Basis, Hearing Continuted to 05/20/2021 at 2:00. O: James Lanik (Phillips, Traci-Michelle)
April 28, 2021 Filing 42 Exhibit 1-9 on First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of of Witness for Hearings on April 29, 2021 . Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 40 Application to Employ SC&H Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor to Debtor Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 28, 2021 Filing 39 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#5 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and Waiving Investment and Deposit Guidelines of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(b), #6 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Obligations Owing in Respect to Debtor's Insurance Policies, #7 Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Under Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service, (II) Approving Adequate Assurance of Payment, and (III) Establishing Procedur, #8 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor's Payment of Pre-Petition (A) Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Claims, (B) Employee Expenses, (C) Funds Deducted and Withheld from Payroll, and (D) Contributions and Benefits Under Employee Ben, #15 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, #16 Order (Generic), #17 Emergency Motion of Debtor for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing The Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B) Scheduling Final Hearings Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule, #19 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Lanik, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 38 Application to Employ Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC as Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 37 Certificate of Service on Order Establishing Procedures for Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021 Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#16 Order (Generic)). (Lanik, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 36 Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Truist Bank (RE: related document(s)#28 Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral , #29 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral) , #31 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Bruton, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Filing 35 Response to (related document(s): #5 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and Waiving Investment and Deposit Guidelines of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(b) filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (Miller, William)
April 27, 2021 Filing 34 Response to (related document(s): #8 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor's Payment of Pre-Petition (A) Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Claims, (B) Employee Expenses, (C) Funds Deducted and Withheld from Payroll, and (D) Contributions and Benefits Under Employee Ben filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (Miller, William)
April 27, 2021 Filing 33 Response to (related document(s): #6 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Obligations Owing in Respect to Debtor's Insurance Policies filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (Miller, William)
April 27, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Formation of Creditors' Committee Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Miller, William)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing for 4/29/21 at 10:30 am (RE: related document(s)#28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral). (Whitesell, S.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James R. Hundley Filed by Creditor H. Richard Hallman. (Hundley, James)
April 27, 2021 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Truist Bank) Hearing scheduled 4/29/2021 at 10:30 AM. (Whitesell, S.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 29 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #28 Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Truist Bank. (Bruton, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 28 Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Creditor Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, E, F, G, G-1) (Bruton, Daniel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 27 Bankruptcy Administrators Motion for Status Conference Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller. (Miller, William)
April 26, 2021 The Bankruptcy Administrator gives notice that the BA has reviewed the related document, and has no objection. The BA does not wish to be heard as to the relief requested. The BA comments: Interim and Final Orders should be in the form in the sample form attached as Exhibit 3 to the DIP memo (doc.# 11). Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator William P. Miller (RE: related document(s)#7 Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Under Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service, (II) Approving Adequate Assurance of Payment, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.). (Miller, William)
April 24, 2021 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#14 Designating Party to Act on behalf of Corp/Partnership) Notice Date 04/24/2021. (Admin.)
April 24, 2021 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 04/24/2021. (Admin.)
April 24, 2021 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#2 Missing Documents Due:) Notice Date 04/24/2021. (Admin.)
April 24, 2021 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#3 Chapter 11 Operating Order) Notice Date 04/24/2021. (Admin.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#17 Emergency Motion of Debtor for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing The Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B) Scheduling Final Hearings Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule, #19 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Lanik, James)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#5 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and Waiving Investment and Deposit Guidelines of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(b), #6 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Obligations Owing in Respect to Debtor's Insurance Policies, #7 Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Under Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service, (II) Approving Adequate Assurance of Payment, and (III) Establishing Procedur, #8 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor's Payment of Pre-Petition (A) Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Claims, (B) Employee Expenses, (C) Funds Deducted and Withheld from Payroll, and (D) Contributions and Benefits Under Employee Ben, #15 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Lanik, James)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alan B. Powell Filed by Creditor Pinnacle Bank. (Powell, Alan)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing for 4/29/21 at 10:30 am (RE: related document(s)#17Emergency Motion of Debtor for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing The Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B) Scheduling Final Hearings Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001, As Well As (II) A Final Order Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing on a Final Basis Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc ). (Whitesell, S.)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #17 Generic Motion) and Shortened Notice Period on Motion for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B) Scheduling Final Hearings Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001, as welll as (II) A Final Order Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing on a Final Basis Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 23, 2021 Filing 17 Emergency Motion of Debtor for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing The Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B) Scheduling Final Hearings Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001, As Well As (II) A Final Order Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing on a Final Basis Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 23, 2021 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#17 Emergency Motion of Debtor for (I) An Interim Order (A) Authorizing The Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 and (B) Scheduling Final Hearings Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4001, As Well As (II) A Final Order Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing on a Final Basis Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 4/29/2021 at 10:30 AM. (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Establishing Procedures for Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021. Re: (RE: related document(s)#15 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing for 4/29/21 at 10:30 am (RE: related document(s)#5 Generic Motion, #6 Generic Motion, #7 Generic Motion, #8 Generic Motion). (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Designating H. Richard Hallman to Act on behalf of Corporation.. (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Walter W. Pitt Jr. Filed by Creditor Truist Bank. (Pitt, Walter)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel C. Bruton Filed by Creditor Truist Bank. (Bruton, Daniel)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 Memo to Attorney for Debtor in Possession re: Duties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit bundle) (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #5 Generic Motion, #6 Generic Motion, #7 Generic Motion, #8 Generic Motion) and Shorten Notice Period on Emergency First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtor(s) of H. Richard Hallman in Support of First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor's Payment of Pre-Petition (A) Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Claims, (B) Employee Expenses, (C) Funds Deducted and Withheld from Payroll, and (D) Contributions and Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Under Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service, (II) Approving Adequate Assurance of Payment, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Obligations Owing in Respect to Debtor's Insurance Policies Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and Waiving Investment and Deposit Guidelines of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at Creditors Mtg Room, Greensboro. Proofs of Claims due by 8/15/2021. (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Chapter 11 Operating Order. (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Missing Documents Due: Atty Fee Disclosure Statement due 5/6/2021. Schedule A/B due 5/6/2021. Schedule D due 5/6/2021. Schedule E/F due 5/6/2021. Schedule G due 5/6/2021. Schedule H due 5/6/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/6/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information - Form B 106 - due 5/6/2021. Corporate Resolution due by 5/6/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 5/6/2021. (Whitesell, S.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc. (Lanik, James)
April 22, 2021 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-10222) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A9378124, amount $1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)
April 22, 2021 Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#5 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and Waiving Investment and Deposit Guidelines of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(b) Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc., #6 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Obligations Owing in Respect to Debtor's Insurance Policies Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc..,#7 Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders Under Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service, (II) Approving Adequate Assurance of Payment, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.,#8 Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor's Payment of Pre-Petition (A) Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Claims, (B) Employee Expenses, (C) Funds Deducted and Withheld from Payroll, and (D) Contributions and Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.. Filed by Debtor Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 4/29/2021 at 10:30 AM. (Whitesell, S.)

Search for this case: Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Electronic Data Magnetics, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Lanik
Represented By: Jennifer Barker Lyday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Administrator: William P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?