KAPLAN v. MICRON TECH., INC., et al
Plaintiff: LEONARD M. KAPLAN
Defendant: MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC., MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC., CRUCIAL TECHNOLOGY, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD., SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION, MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION (USA), INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES, A.G., INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC., ELPIDA MEMORY, INC., ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) INC., NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORP., NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORP., USA, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA and ALL DEFENDANTS
Case Number: 1:2005cv00012
Filed: January 5, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: Durham Office
Presiding Judge: FRANK W BULLOCK
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2005. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2005 Copies of doc. #72 and NEF mailed to all counsel of record. Copies of doc. #72, NEF, and docket sheet mailed to the NDCA and the MDL Panel. (McKenzie, Keayba)
July 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that #47 MOTION for Jonathan M. Jacobson to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 7/13/05 (McKenzie, Keayba)
July 8, 2005 Filing 71 MDL Letter from Clerk's office mailed to all counsel of record. (Welch, Kelly)
July 5, 2005 Filing 70 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel Re: MDL 1486, transferring this action pursuant to 28 USC 1407 to the Northern District of California. (Welch, Kelly)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting #63 Motion for Kenneth R. O'Rourke to appear Pro Hac Vice; Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 6/17/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting #51 Motion for Howard M. Ullman to appear Pro Hac Vice; Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 6/17/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting #50 Motion for Ian Simmons to appear Pro Hac Vice; Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 6/17/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting #49 Motion for Joel S. Sanders to appear Pro Hac Vice; Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 6/17/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting #48 Motion for Steven H. Morrissett to appear Pro Hac Vice; Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 6/17/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting #46 Motion for Daniel L. Alexander to appear Pro Hac Vice; Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 6/17/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 14, 2005 MOTIONS #46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dixon. (McCarty, Dianne)
June 14, 2005 MOTIONS #63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dixon. (McCarty, Dianne)
June 6, 2005 Filing 63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of attorney Kenneth R. O'Rourke by HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Steven H. Morrissett in Support of #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Wen C. Chu in Support of #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of T.Y. Chan in Support of #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA in support of #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA; Responses due by 6/27/2005 (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of William Chang filed by Defendant NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION in support of #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION in support of #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION; Responses due by 6/27/2005 (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Han Suk Baek filed by Defendant HYNIX SEMI., INC. in support of #52 MOTION to Dismiss (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant HYNIX SEMI., INC. in support of #52 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss by HYNIX SEMI., INC.; Responses due by 6/27/2005 (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of attorney Howard M. Ullman by NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION USA (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of attorney Ian Simmons by HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of attorneys Joel S. Sanders and Ronald C. Redcay by MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC., MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission for attorney Steven H. Morrissett by WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 47 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of attorney Jonathan M. Jacobson by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD., SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of attorney Daniel L. Alexander by HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint by SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint by NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION USA; jury demand (McKenzie, Keayba) Modified on 6/8/2005 to reflect that there is a jury demand (McKenzie, Keayba).
June 2, 2005 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION (USA)(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC., MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP.(McKenzie, Keayba); Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2005 and modification; doc. scanned and attached again because a page was skewed (McKenzie, Keayba).
June 2, 2005 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) INC.(McKenzie, Keayba)
June 2, 2005 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by ELPIDA MEMORY, INC.(McKenzie, Keayba)
May 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that a ruling on Plaintiffs' motions to remand is DEFERRED pending a decision by the MDL Panel deciding the transfer issues Signed by Judge FRANK W. BULLOCK JR. on 5/18/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
May 12, 2005 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendants HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD., INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG. (McClain, Abby)
May 4, 2005 Filing 31 NOTICE of Order of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring similarly situated case and Notice of Hearing by dfts., INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC., ELPIDA MEMORY, INC., ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) INC., NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION USA, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA, MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC., MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD., SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION, MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION (USA), INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(McKenzie, Keayba)
April 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #28 Motion for Extension of Time, to and including 4/22/05, to File Reply to Response to #23 MOTION to Remand; Reply due by 4/22/2005Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 4/28/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
April 22, 2005 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff LEONARD M. KAPLAN, to Response to #23 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McKenzie, Keayba)
April 14, 2005 MOTIONS #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Remand REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dixon (McCarty, Dianne)
April 11, 2005 Filing 28 MOTION, with consent, for Extension of Time for one (1) week, to and including 4/22/05, to File Reply re #23 MOTION to Remand (McKenzie, Keayba)
April 1, 2005 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Defendants INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC., ELPIDA MEMORY, INC., ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) INC., NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION USA, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA, MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC., MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD., SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION, MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION (USA), INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG to #23 MOTION to Remand filed by LEONARD M. KAPLAN; Reply due by 4/12/2005. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit F-1)(McKenzie, Keayba)
March 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants shall have to and until 6/2/05 to serve their respective answers or other responses to the Complaint; the parties shall report to the Court no later than 6/2/05 their progress in efforts at the nationwide coordination of this and other related cases; Answer due by 6/2/2005. Status Report due by 6/2/2005. Signed by Judge WALLACE W. DIXON on 3/21/05. (McKenzie, Keayba)
March 11, 2005 Filing 25 NOTICE of CONSENT by defendants, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD. and INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG to 1 Notice of Removal (McKenzie, Keayba)
March 11, 2005 MOTIONS #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dixon (McCarty, Dianne)
March 9, 2005 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Plaintiff LEONARD M. KAPLAN re #23 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(McKenzie, Keayba)
March 9, 2005 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand by LEONARD M. KAPLAN; Responses due by 3/30/2005 (McKenzie, Keayba)
March 4, 2005 Filing 22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1 Complaint by LEONARD M. KAPLAN, ALL DEFENDANTS (McKenzie, Keayba)
February 4, 2005 Filing 21 CONSENT TO REMOVAL BY ALL DEFTS. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by ELPIDA MEMORY, INC. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 19 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by NEC ELECTRONICS (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 18 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by MOSEL-VITELIC (USA) (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 17 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by MOSEL-VITELIC CORP. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 16 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by WINBOUND ELEC. AMER. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by WINBOUND ELEC. CORP. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 14 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by NANYA TECH CORP USA (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 13 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by NANYA TECH. CORP. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 12 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by MICRON TECH., INC. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by ELPIDA MEMORY, INC. (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) (N. Dickerson)
February 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (signed by the Clerk) granting [8-1] motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond; Defendants shall have to and including 3/4/05 to serve an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint; reset Answer deadline to 1/31/05 for some defendants [EOD Date 2/4/05]. Ccs. dist. (K. Mckenzie) Modified on 02/04/2005
January 31, 2005 Filing 8 MOTION by MICRON TECH., INC., MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR, SAMSUNG SEMI., INC., MOSEL-VITELIC CORP., MOSEL-VITELIC (USA), INFINEON TECH., NA, HYNIX SEMI., INC., HYNIX SEMI., AMERICA, ELPIDA MEMORY (USA), NEC ELECTRONICS, NANYA TECH. CORP., NANYA TECH CORP USA, WINBOUND ELEC. CORP., WINBOUND ELEC. AMER. to Extend Time, through and including 3/4/05, to answer with consent (K. Mckenzie)
January 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (signed by the Clerk) granting [6-1] consent Motion for Extension of Time; defendants shall have to and until 1/31/05 to serve answer or other response to the Class Action Complaint; reset Answer deadline to 1/31/05 for NEC ELECTRONICS, ELPIDA MEMORY (USA), HYNIX SEMI., AMERICA, INFINEON TECH., NA, SAMSUNG SEMI., INC., and MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR [EOD Date 1/14/05]. Ccs. dist. (K. Mckenzie)
January 11, 2005 Filing 6 MOTION by MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR, SAMSUNG SEMI., INC., INFINEON TECH., NA, HYNIX SEMI., AMERICA, ELPIDA MEMORY (USA), NEC ELECTRONICS for a nineteen (19) day Extension of Time, to and including 1/31/05, to answer with consent (K. Mckenzie) Modified on 01/13/2005
January 5, 2005 Filing 5 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by INFINEON TECH., NA (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 Filing 4 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 Filing 3 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by SAMSUNG SEMI., INC. (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 Filing 2 Rule 7.1(a) Parent Company Disclosure Statement filed by HYNIX SEMI., AMERICA (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 Filing 1 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE filed in State Court as to MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR, SAMSUNG SEMI., INC., INFINEON TECH., NA, HYNIX SEMI., AMERICA, ELPIDA MEMORY (USA), NEC ELECTRONICS, executed on 12/6/04 by certified mail returned receipt (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 See related case(s): MDL 1486 (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 CASE SELECTED FOR MEDIATION (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 Notice of Right to Consent 28 USC 636(c)(2) (K. Welch)
January 5, 2005 **Case assigned to Magistrate Judge DIXON. AO Code 18RA (K. Welch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPLAN v. MICRON TECH., INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD M. KAPLAN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. PATTERSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JOEL S. SANDERS
Represented By: RONALD C. REDCAY
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Represented By: JOEL S. SANDERS
Represented By: RONALD C. REDCAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRUCIAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, INC., LTD.
Represented By: JONATHAN M. JACOBSON
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Represented By: JONATHAN M. JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSEL-VITELIC CORPORATION (USA)
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES, A.G.
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYNIX SEMI., INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: IAN T. SIMMONS
Represented By: KENNETH R. O'ROURKE
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: IAN T. SIMMONS
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Represented By: KENNETH R. O'ROURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELPIDA MEMORY, INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORP.
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: HOWARD M. ULLMAN
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORP., USA
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: HOWARD M. ULLMAN
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINBOUND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA
Represented By: G. MICHAEL BARNHILL
Represented By: JIM D. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?