EPCON COMMUNITIES CAROLINAS, LLC et al v. TILLEY, et al

Plaintiff: EPCON COMMUNITIES CAROLINAS, LLC and EPCON FARRINGTON LLC
Defendant: IRIS M. TILLEY, THOMAS E. TILLEY, MELBA GEORGE, BARBARA WRIGHT and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2011cv00643
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Referring Judge: WALLACE W. DIXON
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 3/21/2016 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation [Doc. # 107 ]; that the Clerk is directed to disburse the interpleaded funds in the amount of $2,025,000, as well as any accrued interest und er Local Rule 67.1, to the Internal Revenue Service-RACS, Attn: Mail Stop 6261, Restitution, 333 W. Pershing Avenue, Kansas City, Missouri, 64108, and that such funds be credited toward Thomas Tilley's restitution obligations in the Judgment in United States v. Tilley, Case Number 1:14CR130 (M.D.N.C. 2015). FURTHER that on this disbursement, all claims in this action are dismissed. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 29, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 7/29/2015 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 94 ; that the United States' Motion for Judgment that Epcon Farm Trust is Nominee of Iris and Thomas Tilley (Doc # 60 ) is DENIED wit hout prejudice to refiling during the subsequent proceedings to resolve the competing claims; that the Epcon Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 87 ) is DENIED as moot; that the Epcon Plaintif fs' Motion for Relief in the Nature of Interpleader (Doc. # 83 ) and Consent Motion for Interpleader Order Pursuant to Settlement Agreements (Doc. # 93 ) are GRANTED as set out herein. Further that the Epcon Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 54(b) Certification (Doc. # 89 ) is GRANTED and the Court specifically certifies that, given that all claims by and against the Epcon Plaintiffs have been resolved and the Epcon Plaintiffs have no further interest in this action, there is no just reason for delay. A final judgment as to the Epcon Plaintiffs will be entered contemporaneously with this Order. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 28, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 3/28/2013 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation [Doc. # 58 ]; that Plaintiffs' Motions to Dismiss [Doc. # 41 , # 47 ] are therefore GRANTED, and the Tilley Defendants' Counterclaims [Doc. # 39 , # 44 ] are DISMISSED. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 1, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 5/1/2012, that Defendants Thomas Tilley, Iris Tilley, and Melba George are given 21 days from the entry of this Order, to and including May 22, 2012, to file an Answer, Mo tion to Dismiss, or other responsive pleading with respect to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Any filing must be clearly labeled and must be filed in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. FURTHER, that the Clerk is directed to set this case for an Initial Pretrial Conference on Thursday, May 24, 2012 at 9:30 a.m.(Daniel, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPCON COMMUNITIES CAROLINAS, LLC et al v. TILLEY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPCON COMMUNITIES CAROLINAS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MEDFORD
Represented By: JUDSON ALLEN WELBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPCON FARRINGTON LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MEDFORD
Represented By: JUDSON ALLEN WELBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRIS M. TILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS E. TILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELBA GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: THOMAS J. JAWORSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?