STUART, et al v. HUFF, et al
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN S. STUART, M.D., JAMES R. DINGFELDER, M.D., DAVID A. GRIMES, M.D., AMY BRYANT, M.D., SERINA FLOYD, M.D., DECKER & WATSON, INC., PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF CENTRAL NORTH CAROLINA, A WOMAN'S CHOICE OF RALEIGH, INC., PLANNED PARENTHOOD HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC. and TAKEY CRIST, M.D.,
Defendant: JANICE E. HUFF, M.D., ROY COOPER, LANIER M. CANSLER, JIM WOODALL, TRACEY E. CLINE, DOUG HENDERSON, BILLY WEST, C. COLON WILLOUGHBY, JR., BENJAMIN R. DAVID, JIM O'NEILL and ERNIE LEE
Case Number: 1:2011cv00804
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C. EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 1/25/2016. The motion for attorneys' fees and expenses is GRANTED and the defendants shall pay the following amounts to the following plaintiffs within ninety days: (1) To ACLU-NC: $70,312.50; (2) To CRR: $509,072.30; (3) To ACLU: $109,556.98; (4) To Planned Parenthood: $136,920.09; (5) To OMelveny & Myers: $217,454.60. (Daniel, J)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 1/17/2014; For the foregoing reasons, both parties' motions for summary judgment, (Docs. 105 , 117 ), will be granted in part and denied in part. A permanent injunction and final judgment will follow. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 12/22/11, that movants' Motion to Intervene (Doc. 44 ) is DENIED. (Law, Trina)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 12/19/2011, that the Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 8 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth in this Memorandum Opin ion. FURTHER, that the Defendants and their agents and successors in office are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing—by civil action, criminal proceeding, administrative action or proceeding, or any other way—the Act's section entitled "Display of real-time view requirement" (to be codified as N.C. Gen. Stat. § 90-21.85) in its entirety, as more specifically set forth in the Preliminary Injunction issued concomitantly herewith. (Lloyd, Donna)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 10/25/2011, that the Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 8 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth in this Memorandum Opinion. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that the Defendants' and their agents and successors in office are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing by civil action, criminal proceeding, administrative action or proceeding, or any other waythe Act's section entitled Display of real-time view requirement (to be codified as N.C. Gen. Stat. § 90-21.85) in its entirety, as more specifically set forth in the Preliminary Injunction issued concomitantly herewith (Lapira, Sharon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STUART, et al v. HUFF, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN S. STUART, M.D.
Represented By: BEBE J. ANDERSON
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. DINGFELDER, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW D. BECK
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID A. GRIMES, M.D.
Represented By: BEBE J. ANDERSON
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY BRYANT, M.D.
Represented By: BEBE J. ANDERSON
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERINA FLOYD, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW D. BECK
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DECKER & WATSON, INC.
Represented By: BEBE J. ANDERSON
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF CENTRAL NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: HELENE T. KRASNOFF
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A WOMAN'S CHOICE OF RALEIGH, INC.
Represented By: BEBE J. ANDERSON
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLANNED PARENTHOOD HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: HELENE T. KRASNOFF
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAKEY CRIST, M.D.,
Represented By: ANDREW D. BECK
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Represented By: ANDREW D. BECK
Represented By: KATHERINE LEWIS PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANICE E. HUFF, M.D.
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY COOPER
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANIER M. CANSLER
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM WOODALL
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY E. CLINE
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG HENDERSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLY WEST
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. COLON WILLOUGHBY, JR.
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN R. DAVID
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM O'NEILL
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNIE LEE
Represented By: STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
Represented By: ISHAM FAISON HICKS
Represented By: THOMAS J. ZIKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?