BURNEY v. MCRAINEY
Petitioner: ROBERT EARL BURNEY, JR.
Respondent: MAJOR MCRAINEY and EARL R. BUTLER
Case Number: 1:2012cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Presiding Judge: N. C. TILLEY
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 1/31/2013 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 33 and 39 ; Petitioner's "Motion for Injunction Against Any Further Court Proceedings in File #11CRS55181&quo t; [Dock. # 32 ] and Petitioner's "Motion for Injunction" [Dock. # 38 ] are DENIED without prejudice in light of the Judgment entered on March 1, 2012 [Dock. # 18 ], and Richardson v. Virginia Dep't of Corr., 437 Fed. Appx. 235 (4th Cir. 2011). (Israel, Lisa)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION - MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/23/2012, that Petitioner's paper-writing (Docket Entry 37 ) is construed as a Motion to Appoint Counsel and is DENIED without prejudice in light of the Jud gment entered on March 1, 2012 (Docket Entry 18 ). ECOMMENDED that Petitioner's "Motion for Injunction" (Docket Entry 38 ) be DENIED without prejudice in light of the Judgment entered on March 1, 2012 (Docket Entry 18 ), and Richardson v. Virginia Dep't of Corr., 437 Fed. Appx. 235 (4th Cir. 2011).(Taylor, Abby)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR on 03/01/2012. The Court has reviewed Petitioner's objections de novo and finds they do not change the substance of the United States Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (Docket Entry 11 ) which is affirmed and adopted. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing a new petition after he has exhausted his remedies in the state courts. (Taylor, Abby)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION - MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/05/2012. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Petitioner § 2254 forms, instructions, and a current application to proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be filed, but then dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Petitioner filing a new petition after he has exhausted his remedies in the state courts.(Taylor, Abby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNEY v. MCRAINEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT EARL BURNEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MAJOR MCRAINEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EARL R. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?