MCLEAN v. CATERPILLAR, INC.
Plaintiff: EDWARD CHARLES MCLEAN
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00421
Filed: May 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Scotland
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Filing 9 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) transferring this action to the District of New Jersey. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 20, 2014 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) Re: MDL 2540 transferring this action to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of June 11, 2014. Received and filed on June 20, 2014. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 19, 2014 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CATERPILLAR, INC. (ROBERTS, STEPHANIE)
June 19, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/21/2014 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
June 18, 2014 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by CATERPILLAR, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Caterpillar Limited Warranty) (ROBERTS, STEPHANIE)
May 27, 2014 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
May 27, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CATERPILLAR, INC. (Garland, Leah)
May 22, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Garland, Leah)
May 22, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
May 22, 2014 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CATERPILLAR, INC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0418-1517756), filed by EDWARD CHARLES MCLEAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (BRYSON, DANIEL)
May 22, 2014 Filing 1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff EDWARD CHARLES MCLEAN (BRYSON, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCLEAN v. CATERPILLAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD CHARLES MCLEAN
Represented By: DANIEL KENT BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE UNDERWOOD ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?