COMMON CAUSE et al v. RUCHO et al

Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE, NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY, LARRY D. HALL, DOUGLAS BERGER, CHERYL LEE TAFT, RICHARD TAFT, ALICE L. BORDSEN, WILLIAM H. FREEMAN, MELZER A. MORGAN, JR., CYNTHIA S. BOYLAN, COY E. BREWER, JR., JOHN MORRISON McNEILL, ROBERT WARREN WOLF, JONES P. BYRD, JOHN W. GRESHAM and RUSSELL G. WALKER, JR.
Defendant: ROBERT A. RUCHO, DAVID R. LEWIS, PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, A. GRANT WHITNEY, JR., PATRICK L. McCRORY, THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS and STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 1:2016cv01026
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L. OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION. WYNN, Circuit Judge, wrote the opinion, in which BRITT, Senior District Judge, concurred. OSTEEN, JR., District Judge, concurs in part and dissents in part. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP, 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP(Marsh, Keah)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING LEGISLATIVE DEFENDANTS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY signed by JUDGE JAMES A. WYNN, JR., JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., and JUDGE W. EARL BRITT on 01/16/2018, as set out herein. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP, 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP (Garland, Leah)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Circuit Judge Wynn wrote the majority opinion in which Senior District Judge Britt concurred. District Judge Osteen, Jr., wrote a separate opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP, 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP(Daniel, J)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Circuit Judge Wynn, Jr., wrote the opinion in which Senior District Judge Britt joined. Chief District Judge Osteen, Jr. concurred. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP, 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP (Garland, Leah)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying (74) Motion to Stay in case 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP and denying (73) Motion to Stay in case 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP. A written opinion will follow. Signed by JUDGE W. EARL BRITT on 8/29/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP, 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP (Marsh, Keah)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by JUDGE JAMES A. WHYNN, JR., CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR, and JUDGE W. EARL BRITT on 03/03/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-01026-WO-JEP, 1:16-cv-01164-WO-JEP(Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMON CAUSE et al v. RUCHO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY D. HALL
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS BERGER
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL LEE TAFT
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TAFT
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE L. BORDSEN
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM H. FREEMAN
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELZER A. MORGAN, JR.
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA S. BOYLAN
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COY E. BREWER, JR.
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MORRISON McNEILL
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WARREN WOLF
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONES P. BYRD
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. GRESHAM
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL G. WALKER, JR.
Represented By: EMMET J. BONDURANT
Represented By: JASON J. CARTER
Represented By: CAROLINE P. MACKIE
Represented By: EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR.
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT A. RUCHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID R. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY K. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. GRANT WHITNEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK L. McCRORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?