FINCH, et al v. BASF CATALYSTS LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN DELENOR FINCH and ANN FINCH
Defendant: BASF CATALYSTS LLC, COVIL CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, INC., MCNEIL & NRM, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and PFIZER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01077
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 05/01/2019, that Covil's motion for judgment as a matter of law, or alternatively, for a new trial, Doc. 493 , is DENIED. Covil's motion for leave to file supplemental brief, Doc. 520 , is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 08/22/2018, that the defendant McNeil & NRM's motion to strike, Doc. 322 , is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant McNeil &NRM's motion for summary judgment, Doc. 288 , is GRANTED. (Taylor, Abby)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 08/16/2018, that the defendant Covil Corporation's motion for summary judgment, Doc. 276 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set out herein. FURTHER that the defendant Covil's motion, Doc. 318 , to strike Exhibit 26 to the plaintiff's brief in opposition is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 06/08/2018, that the plaintiff's motion for spoliation sanctions, Doc. 210 , is DENIED. FURTHER that the defendant's motion to strike the proffered report and testing of Mr. Fitzgerald and to exclude Mr. Fitzgerald as a putative expert witness, Doc. 239 , is GRANTED.(Taylor, Abby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FINCH, et al v. BASF CATALYSTS LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN DELENOR FINCH
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN FINCH
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CATALYSTS LLC
Represented By: KELLY BROOKS JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL & NRM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: TRAVIS ANDREW BUSTAMANTE
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?