NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, et al v. THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, et al
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, MOORE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, JAMES EDWARD ARTHUR, SR., JAMES MICHAEL BROWER, GRACE BELL HARDISON and JAMES L. COX
Defendant: THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, A. GRANT WHITNEY, JR., RHONDA K. AMOROSO, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, JOSHUA D. MALCOLM, JAMES BAKER, MAJA KRICKER, THE BEAUFORT COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JAY MCROY, JOHN B. TATE, III, THOMAS S. PAYNE, II, KELLIE HARRIS HOPKINS, MOORE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, SUSAN T. ADAMS, CAROLYN M. MCDERMOTT, WILLIAM R. PARKE, GLENDA M. CLENDENIN, CUMBERLAND COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, JAMES H. BAKER, ROBERT KEVIN HIGHT, HARVEY RAYNOR, III and TERRI ROBERTSON
Interested_party: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 1:2016cv01274
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C. BIGGS
Presiding Judge: JOE L. WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1971
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND JUDGMENT. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 8/7/2018. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 9/26/2017, that the Cumberland Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 59 ), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that any claims made b y Individual Plaintiffs and the Moore NAACP against Cumberland Defendants are DISMISSED; and the motion is DENIED as to all other claims. The Moore Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, (ECF No. 61 ), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART . The motion is GRANTED to the extent that any claims made against the Moore Defendants by Individual Plaintiffs Arthur, Hardison and Cox are DISMISSED; and the motion is DENIED as to all other claims. The Beaufort Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 56 ), is DENIED in its entirety.(Daniel, J)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 11/4/2016, that the Court concludes that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction should be, in this Court's discretion, granted in part and denied in part. An Order granting a Preliminary Injunction shall be filed simultaneously with this Memorandum Opinion. (Butler, Carol)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, et al v. THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NORTH CAROLINA STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. GRANT WHITNEY, JR.
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONDA K. AMOROSO
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM WESTBROOK STRACH
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA D. MALCOLM
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BAKER
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJA KRICKER
Represented By: JAMES BERNIER, JR.
Represented By: ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BEAUFORT COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY MCROY
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: DONALD M. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN B. TATE, III
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: DONALD M. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS S. PAYNE, II
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: DONALD M. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLIE HARRIS HOPKINS
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: DONALD M. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOORE COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: MISTY R. LELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN T. ADAMS
Represented By: MISTY R. LELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN M. MCDERMOTT
Represented By: MISTY R. LELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM R. PARKE
Represented By: MISTY R. LELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENDA M. CLENDENIN
Represented By: MISTY R. LELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMBERLAND COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: RICKEY L. MOOREFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES H. BAKER
Represented By: RICKEY L. MOOREFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT KEVIN HIGHT
Represented By: RICKEY L. MOOREFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVEY RAYNOR, III
Represented By: RICKEY L. MOOREFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRI ROBERTSON
Represented By: RICKEY L. MOOREFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP
Represented By: ERIC P. BROWN
Represented By: MARY J. CARLSON
Represented By: CONNIE K. CHAN
Represented By: PENDA DENISE HAIR
Represented By: IRVING L. JOYNER
Represented By: LEAH J. KANG
Represented By: STACEY M. LEYTON
Represented By: CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY
Represented By: PEDER J. THOREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOORE COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP
Represented By: ERIC P. BROWN
Represented By: MARY J. CARLSON
Represented By: CONNIE K. CHAN
Represented By: PENDA DENISE HAIR
Represented By: IRVING L. JOYNER
Represented By: LEAH J. KANG
Represented By: STACEY M. LEYTON
Represented By: CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY
Represented By: PEDER J. THOREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EDWARD ARTHUR, SR.
Represented By: ERIC P. BROWN
Represented By: MARY J. CARLSON
Represented By: CONNIE K. CHAN
Represented By: PENDA DENISE HAIR
Represented By: IRVING L. JOYNER
Represented By: LEAH J. KANG
Represented By: STACEY M. LEYTON
Represented By: CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY
Represented By: PEDER J. THOREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL BROWER
Represented By: ERIC P. BROWN
Represented By: MARY J. CARLSON
Represented By: CONNIE K. CHAN
Represented By: PENDA DENISE HAIR
Represented By: IRVING L. JOYNER
Represented By: LEAH J. KANG
Represented By: STACEY M. LEYTON
Represented By: CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY
Represented By: PEDER J. THOREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE BELL HARDISON
Represented By: ERIC P. BROWN
Represented By: MARY J. CARLSON
Represented By: CONNIE K. CHAN
Represented By: PENDA DENISE HAIR
Represented By: IRVING L. JOYNER
Represented By: LEAH J. KANG
Represented By: STACEY M. LEYTON
Represented By: CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY
Represented By: PEDER J. THOREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. COX
Represented By: ERIC P. BROWN
Represented By: MARY J. CARLSON
Represented By: CONNIE K. CHAN
Represented By: PENDA DENISE HAIR
Represented By: IRVING L. JOYNER
Represented By: LEAH J. KANG
Represented By: STACEY M. LEYTON
Represented By: CAITLIN SWAIN-MCSURELY
Represented By: PEDER J. THOREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?