CROMARTIE v. NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CROMARTIE, JR.
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, TRAVIS BRIDGES, MICHEAL JOHNSTON, KATY POOLE, WINDLEY, RONALD COVINGTON, SHANICE SMITH, JONATHAN FLOYD, DEAN LOCKLEAR, WILLIAM BULLARD, JERRY INGRAM, JR., CONNIE LOCKLEAR-JONES, PAULETTA PIERCE, ERIC A. HOOKS and NCDPS-PRISONS
Case Number: 1:2017cv00980
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Scotland
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C. BIGGS
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 6/3/2024; that the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, (ECF No. 151 ), is ADOPTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce, (ECF No. 143 ), is DENIED in its entirety, and that Plaintiff's Motion for Writ, (ECF No. 150 ), likewise is DENIED. This dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new Section 1983 Complaint on the proper forms in the proper district alleging new constitu tional violations apart from the settlement agreement or filing a breach of contract claim in state court or filing a Rule 60(b) Motion that would not involve enforcement of the settlement agreement or summary judgment. A Judgment dismissing this action will be entered contemporaneously with this Order. (sh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 9/14/2020 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation; ORDERED that Defendant North Carolina Department of Public Safety's Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 108 ), is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Jonathan Floyd and Eric A. Hooks are DISMISSED FROM THE CASE based on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim against them upon which relief may be granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion fo r Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 105 ), is GRANTED IN ITS ENTIRETY as to Defendants William Bullard, Ronald Covington, Jerry Ingram, Jr., Dean Locklear, Pauletta Pierce, Katy Poole, Shanice Smith, and Lt. Windley, and that it is GRANTED as to Defendant s Travis Bridges and Michael Johnston as to all claims except as to Plaintiff's claim that they violated his rights through the use of excessive force on November 23, 2016, and that the Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff� 39;s excessive force claims against Defendants Travis Bridges and Michael Johnston in their individual capacities in light of the genuine issues of material fact. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED in light of the current limits on jury trials resulting from the COVID-19 pandemic, and the Parties shall file status reports after 180 days with respect to whether the case would be ready to set for trial. (Hicks, Samantha)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/21/2020; ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Relief [Doc. # 115 ],Motion for Ruling [D oc. # 117 ], Motion of Responses [Doc. # 118 ], and Motion Regarding an Address Change [Doc. # 120 ] are denied as set out above. RECOMMENDED that Defendant North Carolina Department of Public Safety's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 108 ] be granted. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Defendants Jonathan Floyd and Eric A. Hooks be dismissed from the case based on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim against them upon which relief may be granted. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion for Su mmary Judgment [Doc. # 105 ] be granted in its entirety as to Defendants William Bullard, Ronald Covington, Jerry Ingram, Jr., Dean Locklear, Pauletta Pierce, Katy Poole, Shanice Smith, and Lt. Windley, and that it be granted as to Defendants Travi s Bridges and Michael Johnston as to all claims except as to Plaintiff's claim that they violated his rights through the use of excessive force on November 23, 2016, and that the Motion for Summary Judgment be denied as to Plaintiff's ex cessive force claims against Defendants Travis Bridges and Michael Johnston in their individual capacities in light of the genuine issues of material fact. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this case be STAYED in light of the current limits on jury trials resulting from the COVID-19 pandemic, and the Parties should file status reports after 180 days with respect to whether the case would be ready to set for trial. (Hicks, Samantha)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Judge Loretta C. Biggs on 03/11/2019, that the court affirms and adopts the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Defendant Locklear-Jones's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 32 is GRANTED as to any claims raised by Plaintiff in this action against Defendant Locklear-Jones, and that he claims against Defendant Locklear-Jones are DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a separate complaint or seeing out the factual ba sis for his claims, if any, after he has exhausted his administrative remedies. FURTHER, that Plaintiff's "Motion for Restraining Order Indefinitely" 43 , Motion to Restore Full Motion of Restraint/Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief Expediously (sic) 70 , and "Motion for an Affirmative Notice" 73 are DENIED at this time. (Coyne, Michelle)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROMARTIE v. NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CROMARTIE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS BRIDGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHEAL JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATY POOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD COVINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANICE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN FLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN LOCKLEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BULLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY INGRAM, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LOCKLEAR-JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULETTA PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC A. HOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCDPS-PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?