SCHERMERHORN V. EASYGO PRODUCTS, ET AL.
Plaintiff: William R Schermerhorn, Jr. and WILLIAM R. SCHERMERHORN, JR.
Defendant: MICHAEL CHAKLOS, EASYGO PRODUCTS, PAUL CHAKLOS and A&B, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00666
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff WILLIAM R. SCHERMERHORN, JR (KLEIN, ELIZABETH)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by A&B, INC., MICHAEL CHAKLOS, PAUL CHAKLOS, EASYGO PRODUCTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HATHAWAY, ANDREW)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for All Defendants. Answer due by 9/26/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/23/2018. (Brubaker, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to EASYGO PRODUCTS served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to PAUL CHAKLOS served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (ROSSABI, AMIEL)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH M. KLEIN on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM R. SCHERMERHORN, JR (KLEIN, ELIZABETH)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to A&B, INC., MICHAEL CHAKLOS, PAUL CHAKLOS, and EASYGO PRODUCTS. (Attachments: #1 AB, #2 P. CHAKLOS, #3 M. CHAKLOS)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 1, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 1, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A&B, INC., MICHAEL CHAKLOS, PAUL CHAKLOS, EASYGO PRODUCTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2397350.), filed by William R Schermerhorn, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '217 Patent)(ROSSABI, AMIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHERMERHORN V. EASYGO PRODUCTS, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CHAKLOS
Represented By: ANDREW DAVID HATHAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASYGO PRODUCTS
Represented By: ANDREW DAVID HATHAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL CHAKLOS
Represented By: ANDREW DAVID HATHAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&B, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW DAVID HATHAWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Schermerhorn, Jr.
Represented By: AMIEL J. ROSSABI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R. SCHERMERHORN, JR.
Represented By: AMIEL J. ROSSABI
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?