HOAGLIN, M.D. v. DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC, et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.
Defendant: JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D. and DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00680
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/3/2018, that the Consent Motion [Doc. #18 ] is GRANTED and the Plaintiff may respond to Defendants' Motion on or before October 17, 2018. (Butler, Carol)
October 3, 2018 Telephone call from Attorney Kimberly Lehman on 10/3/2018. She advised the Clerk's Office that the Defendant will not be filing a response to #16 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. (Blay, Debbie)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D., to Response to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ACGME Regulations, #2 Supplement Varsity Gold case-unpub, #3 Supplement SeaCast case-unpub, #4 Supplement Sheasley case-unpub, #5 Supplement Tracy case-unpub, #6 Supplement Benzra cae-unpub, #7 Supplement NC Contracting case-unpub, #8 Supplement Generation Cos Case-unpub, #9 Supplement Lampkin case-unpub, #10 Supplement Baga case-unpub, #11 Supplement White Oak Power case-unpub)(PHILBECK, JOHN)
September 28, 2018 Motion Referred: RE: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss) , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to extend)(PHILBECK, JOHN)
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 Plaintiff's BRIEF re #16 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Motion to Remand by Plaintiff MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D. filed by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.. (PHILBECK, JOHN)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Motion to Remand by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2018 (PHILBECK, JOHN)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D. filed by JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. Replies due by 10/2/2018 (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2018 (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 Plaintiff's BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Certificate of Word Count. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement)(PHILBECK, JOHN)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 ****FILED IN ERROR****Plaintiff's BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement)(PHILBECK, JOHN) Modified on 8/30/2018 to reflect filed in error and remove from public view. See #12 . (Butler, Carol)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Hoaglin)(PHILBECK, JOHN)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D. and DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. Answer due by 9/12/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/06/2018. (Brubaker, John)
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. (Original document issued in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS3093 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., filed by MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D. (Original document filed in Durham County Superior Court, in case number 18CVS3093 and listed as exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT A. SAR on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC d/b/a DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (SAR, ROBERT)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC d/b/a DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Consent Motion)(LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC d/b/a DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D.. (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY JOYCE LEHMAN on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC d/b/a DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2401057.), filed by JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D., DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC d/b/a DUKE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court pleadings)(LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOAGLIN, M.D. v. DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA SETH BRODER, M.D.
Represented By: KIMBERLY JOYCE LEHMAN
Represented By: ROBERT A. SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: KIMBERLY JOYCE LEHMAN
Represented By: ROBERT A. SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL C. HOAGLIN, M.D.
Represented By: JOHN HEYDT PHILBECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?