COVINGTON v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: NAKIA COVINGTON
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv00693
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Stanly
0 Judge: L PATRICK AULD
1 Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to NANCY BERRYHILL served on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
August 14, 2018 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 13, 2018 5 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
August 13, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to NANCY BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Garland, Leah)
August 13, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/13/2018, that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a). (Garland, Leah)
August 10, 2018 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 10, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 10, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by NAKIA COVINGTON. (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
August 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY BERRYHILL, filed by NAKIA COVINGTON.(HALL, CHARLOTTE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COVINGTON v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAKIA COVINGTON
Represented By: CHARLOTTE W. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?