WARNER v. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CURTIS WARNER
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP and MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00727
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Joint Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint and shall file any response to #2 Motion for Class Certification and Preliminary Injunction by 11/26/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/18/18. (AULD, L.)
October 18, 2018 Motion Referred: RE: #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Respond to to Motion for Class Certification, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Respond to to Motion for Class Certification by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ENLOE, CAREN)
September 28, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. and MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint and shall respond to #2 Motion to Certify Class and for Preliminary Injunction by 10/26/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/28/2018. (AULD, L.)
September 27, 2018 Motion Referred: RE: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. for MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC... (GRECO, DANIELLE)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. for MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC.. (GRECO, DANIELLE)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, #2 MOTION to Certify Class under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b)(2) and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC. (GRECO, DANIELLE)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DANIELLE KARA GRECO on behalf of Defendants MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC (GRECO, DANIELLE)
September 14, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Smith Debnam Narron Drake Saintsing and Myers, LLP shall file any response to #2 Motion to Certify Class and for Preliminary Injunction by 10/26/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/14/2018. (AULD, L.)
September 14, 2018 Motion Referred: RE: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP. Answer due by 10/26/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 09/14/2018. (Brubaker, John)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP. (ENLOE, CAREN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP. (ENLOE, CAREN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAREN D. ENLOE on behalf of Defendant SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP (ENLOE, CAREN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CURTIS WARNER as to SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CURTIS WARNER as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CURTIS WARNER as to MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP. (Attachments: #1 MCM, #2 SMITH)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #2 MOTION to Certify Class under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b)(2) and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Corrected Memorandum) by Plaintiff CURTIS WARNER. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
August 24, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b)(2) and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CURTIS WARNER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff Curtis Warner in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Warner Decl. - Midland Pre-Legal Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Warner Decl. - Smith Debnam g Notice, #5 Exhibit C to Warner Decl. - Smith Debnam Notice of Intent, #6 Exhibit D to Warner Decl. - Comenity Notice of Assignment, #7 Exhibit E to Warner Decl. - Midland Welcome Letter, #8 Declaration of Attorney Jonathan R. Miller in Support, #9 Exhibit A to Miller Decl. - Midland website FAQs page, #10 Exhibit B to Miller Decl. - MCM website "Who Is MCM?" page, #11 Declaration of Attorney Brian L. Bromberg in Support, #12 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, JONATHAN)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2413095.), filed by CURTIS WARNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pre-Legal Notice from Midland, #2 Exhibit B - g Notice from Smith Debnam, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Intent from Smith Debnam, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons for Midland Funding, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons for Midland Credit Management, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons for Smith Debnam)(MILLER, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARNER v. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: DANIELLE KARA GRECO
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH DEBNAM NARRON DRAKE SAINTSING & MYERS, LLP
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: DANIELLE KARA GRECO
Represented By: CAREN D. ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS WARNER
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?