GREY v. CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES,LLC
Plaintiff: OFELIA GREY
Defendant: CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00774
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC filed by OFELIA GREY. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Corrected document re #7 Brief. (BARBER-JONES, KATHERINE)
October 8, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NGI Acquisitions LLC for CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC.. (BARBER-JONES, KATHERINE)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC filed by CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC. (BARBER-JONES, KATHERINE)
October 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2018 (BARBER-JONES, KATHERINE)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OFELIA GREY as to CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 11, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CRAIG M. SHAPIRO on behalf of Plaintiff OFELIA GREY. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2424107), filed by OFELIA GREY. (SHAPIRO, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREY v. CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: KATHERINE MARIE BARBER-JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OFELIA GREY
Represented By: CRAIG M. SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?