JONES v. ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DONNA JONES
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA and B.J. BARNES
Case Number: 1:2018cv00783
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONNA JONES. B.J. BARNES waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Travelers)(Coyne, Michelle) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/30/2018) (Coyne, Michelle).
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, B.J. BARNES, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, filed by DONNA JONES. (BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS J. LYONS, JR on behalf of Plaintiff DONNA JONES (LYONS, THOMAS)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for all civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 14, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2426121.), filed by DONNA JONES.(BEGNOCHE, SUZANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.J. BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA JONES
Represented By: SUZANNE R. BEGNOCHE
Represented By: THOMAS J. LYONS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?