STONHAM v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Plaintiff: SEAN STONHAM
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 1:2018cv00821
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (SYMONDS, HANNAH)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIC P. MATHISEN on behalf of Defendant LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON (MATHISEN, ERIC)
October 17, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consented to Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by 11/26/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/17/2018. (AULD, L.)
October 17, 2018 Motion Referred re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Welch, Kelly)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON identifying Corporate Parent LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Liberty Life Assurance Co. of Boston, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Life Insurance Corp. for LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON.. (SYMONDS, HANNAH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (SYMONDS, HANNAH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HANNAH S. SYMONDS on behalf of Defendant LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON (SYMONDS, HANNAH)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (NABORS, DARRYL)
September 28, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 28, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2434390.), filed by Sean Stonham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exh A - LTD Plan, #4 Exhibit Exh B - Job Description, #5 Exhibit Exh C - Centerpoint Clinic Notes, 08/09/15, #6 Exhibit Exh D -Sain Luke's East Clinic Notes, 08/11/15, #7 Exhibit Exh E - UNC Healthcare Progress Notes, 09/01/15, #8 Exhibit Exh F - Sleep Study Result, 01/27/16, #9 Exhibit Exh G - Patient Referral to Dr. Michael Bowman, #10 Exhibit Exh H - Neurology Visit, 06/10/16, #11 Exhibit Exh I - Neurocognitive Evaluation, 07/05/16, #12 Exhibit Exh J - Neurocognitive Evaluation, 09/29/16, #13 Exhibit Exh K - Patient Chart of Dr. Lin, 09/30/16, #14 Exhibit Exh L - UNC Healthcare Progress Notes, 10/05/16, #15 Exhibit Exh M - Denial Letter, 10/27/16, #16 Exhibit Exh N - Patient Charts of Dr. Lin 01/04/17, 01/11/17, 01/16/17, 01/26/17, 02/03/17, #17 Exhibit Exh O - Appeal Letter, 04/25/17, #18 Exhibit Exh P - Second Denial Letter, 06/12/17, #19 Exhibit Exh Q - Second Appeal Letter, 12/7/17, #20 Exhibit Exh R - Final Denial Letter, 01/26/18, #21 Exhibit Exh S - Independent Peer Review of dr. Hertz, 01/17/18, #22 Exhibit Exh T - Independent Peer Review of Dr. Yaft, 01/18/18)(NABORS, DARRYL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STONHAM v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: HANNAH S. SYMONDS
Represented By: ERIC P. MATHISEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN STONHAM
Represented By: DARRYL T. NABORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?