CHRISTIAN V. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: CAROLYN THOMAS CHRISTIAN
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv00949
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Parties in Social Security Case. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2019. Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SSA CASES filed by Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Plaintiff CAROLYN THOMAS CHRISTIAN, Interested Party SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 - Pgs 95-194, #2 Part 3 - Pgs 195-294, #3 Part 4 - Pgs 295-394, #4 Part 5 - Pgs 395-494, #5 Part 6 - Pgs 495-594, #6 Part 7 - Pgs 595-694, #7 Part 8 - Pgs 695-794, #8 Part 9 - Pgs 795-894, #9 Part 10 - Pgs 895-994, #10 Part 11 - Pgs 995-1094, #11 Part 12 - Pgs 1095-1194, #12 Part 13 - Pgs 1195-1294, #13 Part 14 - Pgs 1295-1394, #14 Part 15 - Pgs 1395-1494, #15 Part 16 - Pgs 1495-1594, #16 Part 17 - Pgs 1595-1694, #17 Part 18 - Pgs 1695-1707)(SOMERS, DAVID) Modified on 1/9/2019 to reflect that hard copies were received in the Clerk's office on 01/09/2019 (Coyne, Michelle).
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (SOMERS, DAVID)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to as to (BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. as to (BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to as to (BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Office of General Counsel). (Coyne, Michelle)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 AUSA, #2 USAG)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 15, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2463087.), filed by Carolyn Thomas Christian.(BEDNARIK, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHRISTIAN V. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN THOMAS CHRISTIAN
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BEDNARIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: DAVID E. SOMERS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?