PIERCE v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: JOHN PIERCE
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00950
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/20/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent WELLS FARGO & COMPANY for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A... (REICH, JONATHAN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (REICH, JONATHAN)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER W. LEGG on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN PIERCE (LEGG, CHRISTOPHER)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Answer due by 1/7/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/12/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN REID REICH on behalf of Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (REICH, JONATHAN)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REICH, JONATHAN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
November 15, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2463135.), filed by JOHN PIERCE.(MILLER, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIERCE v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: JONATHAN REID REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN PIERCE
Represented By: WILLIAM STACY MILLER, II
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER W. LEGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?