KIMBALL et al v. HILLIAN et al
Plaintiff: SHAPIRO AND INGLE, NIKKI LYNN KIMBALL and WELLS FARGO
Defendant: JACQUELINE HILLIAN and SAMUEL HILLIAN, JR.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00981
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to Clerk, Rowan County Superior Court re: Remand Order. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/17/2018; that Defendants' Application (Docket Entry #1 ) is GRANTED FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF ALLOWING ENTRY OF AN ORDER REMANDING THIS CASE TO STATE COURT. FURTHER that this case is REMANDED to the Rowan County Superior Court, Rowan County, North Carolina, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Sheets, Jamie)
November 27, 2018 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 27, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 PETITION FOR REMOVAL, filed by SAMUEL HILLIAN, JR, JACQUELINE HILLIAN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by JACQUELINE HILLIAN, SAMUEL HILLIAN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIMBALL et al v. HILLIAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAPIRO AND INGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIKKI LYNN KIMBALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE HILLIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL HILLIAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?