MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., ET AL. V. GHL SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. and MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: GHL SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01005
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Winchester, Robin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW R. GILE on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (GILE, MATTHEW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES J. PROSZEK on behalf of Plaintiffs MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (PROSZEK, JAMES)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for GHL SERVICES, INC. Answer due by 2/4/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 1/2/2019. (Brubaker, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by GHL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FOTHERGILL, DAVID)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID M. FOTHERGILL on behalf of Defendant GHL SERVICES, INC. (FOTHERGILL, DAVID)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RODNEY E. PETTEY on behalf of Defendant GHL SERVICES, INC. (PETTEY, RODNEY)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. Amendment to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BYRNE, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GHL SERVICES, INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BYRNE, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BYRNE, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GHL SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2471728.), filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BYRNE, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., ET AL. V. GHL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BYRNE
Represented By: JAMES J. PROSZEK
Represented By: MATTHEW R. GILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. BYRNE
Represented By: JAMES J. PROSZEK
Represented By: MATTHEW R. GILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RODNEY E. PETTEY
Represented By: DAVID M. FOTHERGILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?