BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. V. JONES, ET AL.
Plaintiff: BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Defendant: AZADIAN GROUP, LLC, RAYMOND C. JONES, JAMES V. PUNELLI, MIDTOWN RESOURCES MCA LLC and CHANGE CAPTIAL PARTNERS FUND 1, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01028
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Termination of Guaranty Agreements)(MCGRATH, JASON)
February 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by RAYMOND C. JONES, JAMES V. PUNELLI. Response to Motion due by 3/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Termination of Guaranty Agreements)(MCGRATH, JASON)
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . (MCGRATH, JASON)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. to Motion for Ext. of Time filed by JAMES V. PUNELLI. (MCGRATH, JASON) Modified on 2/12/2019 to correct title of document (Taylor, Abby).
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Set Aside Default by JAMES V. PUNELLI. Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019 (MCGRATH, JASON)
February 6, 2019 Set/Reply Deadline re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default : Replies due by 2/11/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default , filed by JAMES V. PUNELLI PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PUNELLIS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT filed by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Replies due by 2/11/2019 (PARRY, KIRK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by Clerk of Court, JOHN S. BURBAKER on 02/01/2019. In accordance with the Order entered by the Honorable Joe L. Webster on February 1, 2019, default is hereby entered against Defendant JAMES V. PUNELLI. (Taylor, Abby)
February 1, 2019 Set/Response Deadline 02/08/2019. re #12 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default. See Text Order entered on 02/01/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
February 1, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default and directing the Clerk to enter a default as to Defendant James V. Punelli, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), in light of the fact that Defendant Punelli was served with the Complaint and Summons on December 26, 2018 (Docket Entry 9), and Defendant did not timely "plead or otherwise defend" the Complaint on or before January 16, 2019. Defendant Punelli's Letter filed with the Court on January 22, 2019 shows that he received the Complaint and Summons by mail. (Docket Entry 12.) Proof of service is further demonstrated by Plaintiff's Affidavit showing Defendant Punelli was served on December 26, 2018. (Docket Entry 9.) Therefore, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is directed to enter a default as to Defendant James V. Punelli. Furthermore, the Court will construe Defendant Punelli's Letter document (Docket Entry 12) as a Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 8, 2019 to file any response to Defendant's motion. Thereafter, Defendant Punelli shall file a reply within 5 days of the filing of Plaintiff's response. Should the Court thereafter set aside the entry of default, the undersigned will then determine when an Answer or other responsive pleadings are due. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 2/1/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
January 24, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #11 MOTION for Entry of Default to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sanders, Marlene)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by JAMES V. PUNELLI filed by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. Replies due by 2/6/2019 (ALVAREZ, IGNACIO)
January 23, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complain to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Sanders, Marlene)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default by JAMES V. PUNELLI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Taylor, Abby) Modified to correct title of document per Text Order entered on 02/01/2019. (Taylor, Abby).
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (PARRY, KIRK)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. RAYMOND C. JONES waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (PARRY, KIRK)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to JAMES V. PUNELLI served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (PARRY, KIRK)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Midtown Resources MCA LLC, Azadian Group LLC and Change Capital Partners Fund I LLC by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (PARRY, KIRK) Modified on 12/28/2018 to correct title of document (Taylor, Abby).
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. of Special Appearance (ALVAREZ, IGNACIO)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RAYMOND C. JONES, and JAMES V. PUNELLI. (Attachments: #1 Jones)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
December 19, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIRK ALAN PARRY, JR on behalf of Plaintiff Blue Force Technologies, Inc. (PARRY, KIRK)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Force Technologies, Inc.. (PARRY, KIRK)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2479097.), filed by Blue Force Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Affidavit of James V. Punelli, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Affidavit of Raymond C. Jones)(PARRY, KIRK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. V. JONES, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE FORCE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: KIRK ALAN PARRY, JR.
Represented By: IGNACIO MIGUEL ALVAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZADIAN GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND C. JONES
Represented By: JASON A. MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES V. PUNELLI
Represented By: JASON A. MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDTOWN RESOURCES MCA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANGE CAPTIAL PARTNERS FUND 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?