SAWYERS V. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.
Plaintiff: BARRY SAWYERS
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01037
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: N C TILLEY
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. filed by BARRY SAWYERS. Replies due by 2/27/2019 (OXENDINE, RYAN)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (MOLONY, SUSAN)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed & Dated EEOC Charge)(MOLONY, SUSAN)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. Response to Motion due by 2/13/2019 (MOLONY, SUSAN)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BARRY SAWYERS as to UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (OXENDINE, RYAN)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 26, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2481714.), filed by barry sawyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(OXENDINE, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAWYERS V. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN BALLANTINE MOLONY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY SAWYERS
Represented By: RYAN D. OXENDINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?